Vincent Brandt v. Kia America, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-05415 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 3:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kia America, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Vincent Brandt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Saturday, June 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form
Sat 06/29 4:20 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to A. Joel Richlin. New Case Number 8:24-cv-01441-FWS-AJRx. (car) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 06/27 10:56 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vincent Brandt, upon Defendant Kia America, Inc. served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity(Poulin, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 06/26 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vincent Brandt, (Poulin, Eric) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Wed 06/26 12:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Vincent Brandt. (Poulin, Eric) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 06/26 12:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Vincent Brandt. (Poulin, Eric) |
|
1 | 1
33
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 06/26 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37725501 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Vincent Brandt. (Attorney Eric Marc Poulin added to party Vincent Brandt(pty:pla))(Poulin, Eric) |