Lee v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John R Adams |
Referred: | James E Grimes Jr |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-01088 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
soc_doc
Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration (atty event)
Thu 08/22 2:22 PM
Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Related document(s)1 . (Blower, David) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy
Tue 07/02 3:31 PM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (M,MT) |
|
5 | 5
order
Magistrate Judges Initial Order
Tue 07/02 3:30 PM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 07/02/2024. (M,MT) |
|
order
Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis
Tue 07/02 3:29 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 07/02/2024.(M,MT) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order
Thu 06/27 2:45 PM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 6/27/2024. (B,DL) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Thu 06/27 2:42 PM
Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (B,DL) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/27 2:43 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (B,DL) |
||
oth_evt
Notice of Social Security Complaint
Thu 06/27 2:44 PM
Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (B,DL) |
||
order
Automatic Reference of Administrative Action
Thu 06/27 2:47 PM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge John R. Adams on 6/27/2024. (B,DL) |
||
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Status Report (atty event)
Wed 06/26 4:44 PM
Status Report filed by Donna Marie Lee. (Wicklund, Edward) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/26 4:43 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Donna Marie Lee. (Wicklund, Edward) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/26 4:43 PM
Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Donna Marie Lee. (Wicklund, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |