Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Marilyn L Huff |
Referred: | Daniel E Butcher |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01103 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0101 Copyright Infringement (definitions) |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 2:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 02 2024
ORDER Granting 4 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 8/1/24. (aas) |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Fri 08/02 10:34 AM
ORDER Granting4 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 8/1/24. (aas) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Discovery
Tue 07/23 7:07 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support | ||
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/26 2:56 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (jms) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Wed 06/26 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (ggv) (jms) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/26 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18966286.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. [Copyright Report Mailed] The new case number is 3:24-cv-1103-H-DEB. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Bandlow, Lincoln)(ggv) (jms) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Complaint & Copyright Report, | ||
Att: 3 Copyright Report |