Buechel v. Solgen Power LLC
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary K Dimke |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00219 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441ed Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Spokane County Superior Court, 24-00002-02496-32 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 4:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Solgen Power LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Buechel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Disclosure Statement - Diversity Cases Only
Fri 09/13 10:32 AM
RULE 7.1 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert Buechel. (Bergman, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 09/12 4:20 PM
BENCH TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2025 at 01:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755. Bench Trial set for 12/8/2025 at 09:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755, commencing with a Final Pretrial Conference at 08:30 AM . Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (WMK, Case Administrator) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 09/11 3:20 PM
Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Judge Mary K. Dimke: Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2024. (CV, Courtroom Deputy) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/10 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam T Pankratz on behalf of Solgen Power LLC (Attorney Adam T Pankratz added to party Solgen Power LLC(pty:dft))(Pankratz, Adam) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Status Report
Thu 09/05 3:46 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Solgen Power LLC. (Fletcher, Kathryn) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Scheduling Conference Notice
Fri 08/16 4:50 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2024 at 02:00 PM in Richland Courtroom 189 via Video Conference before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (CV, Courtroom Deputy) |
|
Att: 1 Consent to Magistrate Judge Form | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 08/12 3:50 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Mary K. Dimke for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea no longer assigned to case. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (RG, Chief Deputy) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/03 11:53 AM
Solgen Power, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint for Employment Discrimination by Solgen Power LLC.(Fletcher, Kathryn) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/26 3:12 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Solgen Power LLC. (Fletcher, Kathryn) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Wed 06/26 2:53 PM
DECLARATION of Kathryn P. Fletcher in Support of Notice of Removal re1 Notice of Removal by Solgen Power, LLC.(Fletcher, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Declaration
Wed 06/26 2:48 PM
DECLARATION of Josh Siano in Support of Notice of Removal re1 Notice of Removal by Solgen Power, LLC. (Fletcher, Kathryn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 06/26 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $405; Receipt #AWAEDC-4577202 Filed by Solgen Power, LLC.(Fletcher, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 06/26 3:08 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator) |