Irma Janet Rodriguez v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-01341 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Riverside Superior Court, CVRI2306909 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 3:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Nissan North America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Irma Janet Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 07/25 3:53 PM
Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 09/23/2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 09/16/2024. (eva) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 07/01 1:47 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 06/27 11:33 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 06/27 11:32 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Thu 06/27 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge James V. Selna. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:24-cv-1341 JVS (SKx). (sh) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 06/26 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., identifying NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.. (Dye, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 06/26 4:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Dye, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 06/26 4:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number CVRI2306909 Receipt No: ACACDC-37728608 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen H Dye added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dye, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of S. Dye, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 06/27 11:18 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Nissan North America, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Irma Janet Rodriguez.[FILED IN STATE COURT 1/8/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 06/27 11:20 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT 3/8/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 AS ATTACHED TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh) |