Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer C Boal |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-11649 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 6:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 07 2024
Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered GRANTING 6 Motion for Discovery. (Hutchins, Aaron) |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Wed 08/07 9:38 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered GRANTING 6 Motion for Discovery. (Hutchins, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 07/18 10:10 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Paige, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Arco, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer | ||
6 | 6
motion
Discovery
Thu 07/18 10:08 AM
MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/28 9:39 AM
Summons Issued as to John Doe. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/27 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Martin, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report on the filing/termination of copyright case
Wed 06/26 10:35 PM
REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case .(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/26 10:34 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/26 10:32 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10481075 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form |