Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Myong J Joun |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-11663 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 6:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/11 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (James, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Protective Order
Thu 07/25 4:59 PM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER . (York, Steve) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Thu 07/25 4:58 PM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ORDER entered GRANTING 6 Motion for Discovery, Third Party Early Discovery. (York, Steve) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 07/18 10:58 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Paige, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Arco, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer | ||
6 | 6
motion
Discovery
Thu 07/18 10:56 AM
MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/28 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to John Doe. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 06/27 3:04 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report on the filing/termination of copyright case
Wed 06/26 11:48 PM
REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case .(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/26 11:47 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/26 11:46 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10481128 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form |