Henderson v. Trump
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Referred: | Brian W Mckay |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01587 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 6:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Donald Trump
|
|
Plaintiff
Tisha Henderson
1106 Betterton Circle
Dallas, TX 75203 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
14
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 08/23 1:10 PM
Special Order No. 3-354: Effective August 23, 2024, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Magistrate Judge Brian McKay and shall henceforth carry the suffix letters BW. This case has been reassigned pursuant to Special Order No. 3-354. (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge David C. Godbey on 8/23/2024) (cea) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Fri 07/19 10:57 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SCREENING AND STANDING ORDER. Judicial screening of this case is pending. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). It is therefore ORDERED that (1) service of process shall be withheld pending completion of judicial screening, (2) no motions for appointment of counsel shall be filed until the Court has completed the screening process, (3) all discovery in this case is stayed until the Court enters a scheduling order, (4) no amendments or supplements to the complaint shall be filed without prior Court approval, and (5) any motion to amend the complaint must be accompanied by a complete proposed amended complaint on the required form. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly notify the Court in writing of any change of address by filing a written "Notice of Change of Address" with the Clerk of the Court. Failure to provide updated address information may result in the dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute or follow court order under Fed. R. Civ. 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/19/2024) (chmb) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/19 10:47 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/19/2024) (chmb) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 07/19 12:19 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Jul 19 12:19:54 CDT 2024 (crt) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 07/19 12:32 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Fri Jul 19 12:32:00 CDT 2024 (crt) |
||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 06/28 11:29 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of document #6 Fri Jun 28 11:29:23 CDT 2024 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Thu 06/27 2:17 PM
Court Request for Recusal: Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Renee Toliver assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (kaf) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 06/26 3:14 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Wed Jun 26 15:14:24 CDT 2024 (crt) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges (Public Entry)
Fri 06/28 7:57 AM
Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver added. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (cea) |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/26 3:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tisha Henderson. (agc) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/26 3:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tisha Henderson. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (agc) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/26 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Donald Trump filed by Tisha Henderson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (agc) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Wed 06/26 3:11 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (agc) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Scholer
Wed 06/26 3:10 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc) |