Khalid Hashmi et al v. United States of America et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Brianna Fuller Mircheff |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-05452 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 3:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Mary Bridges
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Khalid Hashmi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Sunday, June 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Sun 06/30 9:57 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (cr) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/28 12:47 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant United States of America. (et) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 06/28 12:42 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 06/28 12:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 06/28 12:41 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (et) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 06/27 10:44 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 Mary Bridges, Khalid Hashmi. (Bloeser, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 06/27 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Bloeser, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 06/27 10:41 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Mary Bridges, Khalid Hashmi. (Bloeser, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 06/27 10:40 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-37732271 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Khalid Hashmi, Mary Bridges. (Attorney Jeffrey Thomas Bloeser added to party Mary Bridges(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Thomas Bloeser added to party Khalid Hashmi(pty:pla))(Bloeser, Jeffrey) |