Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle v. Gebrekidan et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | David G Estudillo |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-05517 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 3:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 150
|
|
Defendant
Awet Tsehaye
|
|
Defendant
Haile Angesom Tseada
|
|
Defendant
Yonatan Tewelde
|
|
Defendant
Esayas Tewolde Tesfamicael
|
|
Defendant
Afewerki Tesfamariam
|
|
Defendant
Elen Tesfaghiorghis
|
|
Defendant
Gebrehiwet Teklehaimanot
|
|
Defendant
Temesghen Kahsay
|
|
Defendant
Saba Kidane Heritage
|
|
Defendant
Solomon Gebreyesus
|
|
Defendant
Henock Teckle Gebrekidan
|
|
Defendant
Yordanos Gebremichael Gebregiorgis
|
|
Defendant
Hadush Brhane
|
|
Plaintiff
Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 25, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/25 8:52 AM
ORDER re23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eduardo G Roy for Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Statement
Tue 09/24 2:04 PM
STATEMENT of Henok Tekle Gebrekidan Awet Tsehaye Elen Tesfaghiorghis Solomon G. Assefaw Yordanos Gebremicael Gebregiorgis Temesghen Kahsay Haile Tsaeda Afewerki Tesfamariam Yonatan Tewelde Esayas Tewolde Tesfamicael Gebre Tekle Haduish Birhane re27 Statement, Second Amended Diversity Disclosure Statement by Defendants Hadush Brhane, Yordanos Gebremichael Gebregiorgis, Henock Teckle Gebrekidan, Solomon Gebreyesus, Temesghen Kahsay, Gebrehiwet Teklehaimanot, Elen Tesfaghiorghis, Afewerki Tesfamariam, Esayas Tewolde Tesfamicael, Yonatan Tewelde, Haile Angesom Tseada, Awet Tsehaye (Stockwell, Christopher) |
|
30 | 30
order
2 - Minute Order
Tue 09/24 9:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Accordingly, Defendants' Diversity Disclosure Statement (Dkt. No.27 ) IS STRICKEN. These Defendants SHALL file a "Diversity Disclosure Statement" that properly identifies each party's state of citizenship. Authorized by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (CJS) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 09/23 3:02 PM
ORDER ON FILING DATES granting Parties'28 Stipulated MOTION Extension and Waiver of Service . The Parties agree that Represented Defendants shall file their Joint Answer and any Joint Counterclaims on or before 11/1/2024. The Parties further agree that, should Plaintiff decide or be required to file a pleading response to Represented Defendants' Joint Answer and/or Joint Counterclaims, Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 12/13/2024.The Parties further agree to provide FRCP 26 initial disclosures and to conduct the FRCP 26(f) conference no later than 11/22/2024. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(CJS) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Stipulated Motion
Fri 09/20 5:10 PM
Stipulated MOTION Extension and Waiver of Service , filed by Defendants Hadush Brhane, Yordanos Gebremichael Gebregiorgis, Henock Teckle Gebrekidan, Solomon Gebreyesus, Temesghen Kahsay, Gebrehiwet Teklehaimanot, Elen Tesfaghiorghis, Afewerki Tesfamariam, Esayas Tewolde Tesfamicael, Yonatan Tewelde, Haile Angesom Tseada, Awet Tsehaye. Noting Date 9/23/2024, (Stockwell, Christopher) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Statement
Fri 09/20 12:12 PM
STATEMENT of Diversity Amended re26 Notice of Appearance, by Defendants Hadush Brhane, Yordanos Gebremichael Gebregiorgis, Henock Teckle Gebrekidan, Solomon Gebreyesus, Temesghen Kahsay, Gebrehiwet Teklehaimanot, Elen Tesfaghiorghis, Afewerki Tesfamariam, Esayas Tewolde Tesfamicael, Yonatan Tewelde, Haile Angesom Tseada, Awet Tsehaye (Stockwell, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/18 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher J Stockwell on behalf of Defendants Hadush Brhane, Yordanos Gebremichael Gebregiorgis, Henock Teckle Gebrekidan, Solomon Gebreyesus, Temesghen Kahsay, Gebrehiwet Teklehaimanot, Elen Tesfaghiorghis, Afewerki Tesfamariam, Esayas Tewolde Tesfamicael, Yonatan Tewelde, Haile Angesom Tseada, Awet Tsehaye. (Stockwell, Christopher) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application
Fri 08/23 11:16 AM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice23 by attorney Eduardo Roy will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Eduardo Roy) (CDA) |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/22 3:23 PM
ORDER re24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alec Cierny for Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/21 2:05 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas Alexander Cierny FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8595559 (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/21 2:03 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eduardo G. Roy FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8595542 (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
22 | 22
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 08/21 1:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle.(Wyatt, Todd) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 08/14 8:40 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, no later than 08/21/2024, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction based on the failure to identify each party's state of citizenship. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by such date addressing the deficiencies identified herein. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (CJS) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued
Mon 08/05 3:35 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Hadush Brhane, Yordanos Gebremichael Gebregiorgis, Henock Teckle Gebrekidan, Solomon Gebreyesus, Saba Kidane Heritage, Temesghen Kahsay, Gebrehiwet Teklehaimanot, Elen Tesfaghiorghis, Afewerki Tesfamariam, Esayas Tewolde Tesfamicael, Yonatan Tewelde, Haile Angesom Tseada, Awet Tsehaye. (CJS) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 3:01 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Hadush Brhane by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:59 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Gebrehiwet Teklehaimanot by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:58 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Esayas Tesfamicael by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:56 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Yonatan Tewelde by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:25 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Afewerki Tesfamariam by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:24 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Haile Tseada by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:22 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Temesghen Kahsay by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:20 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Yordanos Gebregiorgis by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:16 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Solomon Gebreyesus by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:14 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Awet Tsehaye by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:11 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Elen Tesfaghiorghis by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:09 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Saba Heritage by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/05 2:04 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Henock Gebrekidan by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 08/02 1:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo for all further proceedings. Hon. S. Kate Vaughan no longer assigned to case. (SNP) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice-Other
Fri 08/02 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Non-Consent to Magistrate ; filed by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle. (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 06/28 12:51 PM
Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (CJS) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
discov
Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/27 11:30 AM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle. (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
discov
Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/27 11:04 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle. (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/27 10:40 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET; filed by Plaintiff Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle. (Wyatt, Todd) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/27 10:37 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle with JURY DEMAND Attorney Todd W Wyatt added to party Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle(pty:pla) filed by Eritrean Association in Greater Seattle.(Wyatt, Todd) |