ALMAS v. AD HOC LLC
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Reggie B Walton |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01868 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 5:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
AD HOC LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BARATI ALMAS
7307 Quartz Terrace
BOWIE, MD 20720 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
13
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 08/28 9:52 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re5 Motion to Dismiss filed by BARATI ALMAS.(Baldwin, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
misc
Errata
Wed 08/28 11:39 AM
ERRATA Defendant's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by AD HOC LLC re5 Motion to Dismiss. |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/26 2:19 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ,7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by BARATI ALMAS.(Baldwin, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
order
.Order
Mon 08/26 12:40 PM
GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 26, 2024. (lcrbw3) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/26 12:21 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by BARATI ALMAS.(Baldwin, Robert) Modified on 8/26/2024; entered in error at the request of chambers (zdp) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
notice
Notice of Error
Mon 08/26 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect court case caption and case number. Please refile. (zdp) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 08/26 5:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the9 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Leave to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted. It is further ORDERED that, on or before August 28, 2024, the plaintiff shall file her opposition to the defendant's motion to dismiss. It is further ORDERED that, on or before September 6, 2024, the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 26, 2024. (lcrbw3) |
||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Thu 08/08 4:29 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AD HOC LLC |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Thu 08/08 4:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by AD HOC LLC. |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/08 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Remy on behalf of AD HOC LLC |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/08 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Bellwoar on behalf of AD HOC LLC (Bellwoar, Andrew) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 06/28 2:21 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to AD HOC LLC.(mg) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/28 2:19 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mg) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/27 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT against AD HOC LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10989869) filed by BARATI ALMAS.(Baldwin, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |