Goodwin v. Walmart Inc. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Anello |
Referred: | Barbara Lynn Major |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01115 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441lm Removal- Labor/Mgmt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02024-00024781-CU-WT-CTL |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 2:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 50
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica Goodwin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Wed 09/04 9:12 AM
ORDER Granting11 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/3/24. (aas) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Protective Order
Tue 09/03 12:13 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Walmart Inc.. (Shihabi, Mohammad) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/21 12:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 12/3/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/21/24.(aas) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation Conference
Tue 08/20 5:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: (Z)Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/20/2024. Case did not settle. (Z)Case Management Conference held on 8/20/2024. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Ricardo Manuel Martin, Ji-Su Park). (Defendant Attorney Mohammad Shihabi). (no document attached) (bll) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Mon 08/12 3:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference is reset for 8/20/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara L. Major. All other dates and deadlines remain as set.(no document attached) (sjr) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Joint Discovery Plan
Wed 07/31 11:01 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Walmart Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) (Shihabi, Mohammad) (bdc) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Mon 07/01 12:34 PM
ORDER Granting Defendant Walmart Inc.'s5 Ex Parte Application to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/9/2024. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/20/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/30/24. (aas) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Continue
Fri 06/28 3:24 PM
Ex Parte MOTION to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines by Walmart Inc..(Shihabi, Mohammad) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Mohammad B. Shihabi, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mohammad B. Shihabi | ||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/27 2:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Shihabi, Mohammad) |
|
3 | 3
8
pgs
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Thu 06/27 1:27 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation & Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/27/2024.(maq) |
|
2 | 2
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Thu 06/27 12:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Walmart Inc. (axi) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/27 12:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18968835.), filed by Walmart Inc. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1115-MMA-BLM. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(axi) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Mohammad B. Shihabi, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F |