Bowers v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Samuel J Horovitz |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00654 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Third Circuit, in and for Columbia County, Florida, 24-00127-CA |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 5:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carla K. Bowers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Thu 08/22 12:34 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2024; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 3/4/2025; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 4/3/2025; Discovery due by 5/2/2025; Conduct mediation hearing by 5/16/2025 (Lead counsel to coordinate dates); Dispositive motions due by 6/3/2025; All other motions due by 9/3/2025; Pretrial statement due by 10/6/2025; Trial Status Conference set for 10/14/2025 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 A before Judge Wendy W. Berger; Jury Trial set for November 2025 trial term commencing 11/3/2025 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 A before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/22/2024. (CKS) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Case Management Report
Tue 08/06 3:53 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Biewend, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/02 2:56 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Carla K. Bowers. (Biewend, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/30 10:56 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Sausaman, Alison) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 07/11 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kris Bradshaw Robinson on behalf of Carla K. Bowers. Lead Counsel: Kris B. Robinson. (Robinson, Kris) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of appearance
Thu 07/11 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kris Bradshaw Robinson on behalf of Carla K. Bowers (Robinson, Kris) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/09 2:25 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Samuel J. Horovitz. New case number: 3:24-cv-654-WWB-SJH. Magistrate Judge J. B. Toomey no longer assigned to the case. (jkl) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 07/03 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alison H. Sausaman on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. Lead Counsel: Alison H. Sausaman. (Sausaman, Alison) Modified on 7/3/2024 to edit docket text (AJS) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 07/02 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 07/02 4:45 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective April 1, 2024, and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/2/2024. (CKS) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/28 11:41 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 4 Complaint by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. Filed in state court on 5/15/2024.(AJS) |
|
4 | 4
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/28 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Carla K. Bowers. Filed in state court on 4/22/2024.(AJS) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 06/28 11:38 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jennifer Catherine Biewend, Miles Wood Igou and Alison H. Sausaman of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/28 9:21 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:24-cv-654-WWB-JBT. (RLK) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/27 5:23 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Columbia County Circuit Court, case number 24-127-CA filed in State Court on April 22, 2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22244775 filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Sausaman, Alison) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 7 State Court ANSWER, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |