FRIENDS OF ANIMALS v. HAALAND et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Ana C Reyes |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01870 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 5:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DEB HAALAND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRIENDS OF ANIMALS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 08/29 11:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court understands from the parties'16 Joint Status Report that Plaintiff "no longer requests a ruling" on its7 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Dkt. 16 at 3. The Court therefore DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to mark that Motion as withdrawn. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 8/29/2024. (lcar3) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/28 5:01 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND. (Brocker, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/27 3:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ana C. Reyes: Status Conference held on 8/27/2024, Status Report due by 5:00 PM on 8/28/2024 Court Reporter Lorraine Herman. (zjch, ) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 08/26 1:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to appear for a video status conference at 3 PM on August 27, 2024. The parties should contact the Courtroom Deputy, Jonathan Hopkins (Jonathan_Hopkins@dcd.uscourts.gov), for log-in information. If it is truly impossible for counsel to appear at the scheduled time, they may coordinate with the Courtroom Deputy to set another time on either August 27 or August 28. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 8/26/2024. (lcar3) |
||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/23 8:35 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS.(Best, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Friends of Animals' Request, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. BLM's Response, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3. August 2024 Email Exchange, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4. Document Request, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5. Meeting Agenda | ||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/06 11:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER. As discussed on the record at yesterday's Motion Hearing, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. BLM will not gather any animals from the Dry Valley Rim, Observation South, or Twin Peaks North ranges during the gather contemplated by the 2024 Decision Record, Dkt. 7-6 ("the challenged gather"), if it takes place. 2. BLM will not issue any task orders for the challenged gather before September 20, 2024. 3. BLM officials with decisionmaking authority over the challenged gather will make themselves available for at least two days of in-person meetings with Plaintiff's representatives during the week of August 12, 2024. The parties will work together in good faith to choose a location and set a schedule. 4. Plaintiff will propose an agenda for the meetings and submit a list of requested documents by 9 AM PT on August 8, 2024. 5. BLM will, on or before August 22, 2024, notify Plaintiff whether it will make any changes to its plans for the challenged gather. BLM will meaningfully explain its decision to Plaintiff. 6. The parties will submit a joint status report on or before August 23, 2024, concerning whether any issues remain for the Court to resolve from Plaintiff's7 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The Court reiterates that it expects the parties to conduct themselves in good faith. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 8/6/2024.(lcar3) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
minutes
Preliminary Injunction
Mon 08/05 4:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ana C. Reyes: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 8/5/2024. The Court Heard Oral Arguments From The Parties. The Court Will Issue A Minute Order. (Court Reporter CHRISTINE ASIF.) (mac) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 07/31 5:23 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS.(Marcuccio, Andreia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Roundup Contract | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 07/24 8:14 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,,,, filed by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND.(Brocker, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Emily Ryan, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Emily Ryan, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Emily Ryan, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Emily Ryan, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Patrick Farris, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Patrick Farris, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Patrick Farris, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Patrick Farris, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Patrick Farris, | ||
Att: 10 Declaration of Andrew Johnson, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit AR Index, 19-cv-3506 | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Thu 07/18 4:14 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 7/8/2024; DEB HAALAND served on 7/8/2024 (Marcuccio, Andreia) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Thu 07/18 4:11 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July 9, 2024. (Marcuccio, Andreia) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Thu 07/18 4:08 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/8/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/6/2024. (Marcuccio, Andreia) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to
Mon 07/15 3:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Courtesy Copies by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS.(Marcuccio, Andreia) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 07/15 10:56 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND.(Cook, Caitlyn) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/15 11:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Preliminary Injunction Briefing Deadlines. The Court hereby ORDERS Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's7 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on or before July 24, 2024, and to respond to Plaintiff's1 Complaint on or before September 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 7/15/2024. (lcar3) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Mon 07/15 3:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Courtesy Copies. The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff may submit its courtesy copies on or before July 18, 2024. The Court further ORDERS that, given the length of the attachments to Plaintiff's7 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiff need not provide courtesy copies of the full record. The Court will, on or before July 16, 2024, email Plaintiff a list of the attachments that Plaintiff must submit in hard copy. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 7/15/2024. (lcar3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 07/16 8:42 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Courtesy copies due by 7/18/2024. (zjch, ) |
||
Saturday, July 13, 2024 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Sat 07/13 8:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's7 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The Motion requests that the Court set a hearing date that allows it sufficient time "to rule on th[e] [M]otion before... September 1, 2024." Dkt. 7 at 2. Because an August 5, 2024 hearing date will enable the Court to meet that deadline, the Court finds that that date "will not prejudice the parties." LCvR 65.1(d). The Court therefore ORDERS the parties to appear for a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion on August 5, 2024, at 10:30 AM. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiff to submit courtesy copies of its1 Complaint, Motion (together with its attachments), and key cases in the format described in the Court's2 Standing Order by close of business on July 15, 2024. And the Court further ORDERS Defendants to file courtesy copies of their forthcoming response (together with any attachments) and key cases within twenty-four business hours of the response's filing. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 7/13/2024. (lcar3) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Fri 07/12 8:45 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS.(Marcuccio, Andreia) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Jesica Johnston, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Craig Downer, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Andreia Marcuccio, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 1: 2024 DNA, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 2: 2024 Decision Record, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 3: 2024 Addendum, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 4: 2019 EA, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 5: 2019 Response to Comments, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 6: 2019 Decision Record, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 7: 2019 FONSI, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 8: 2010 EA, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 9: WHB Handbook, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 10: WHB Removal Handbook, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 11: NEPA Handbook, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 12: 1989 HMAP, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 13: 2023 Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 14: 2020-2023 Lassen County Precipitation, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 15: 2020-2023 Washoe County Precipitation, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 16: 2020-2024 Jan.-June Lassen County Precipitation, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 17: 2020-2024 Jan.-June Washoe County Precipitation, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 18: Erik Lungren et. al 2021, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 19: Erik Lungren et al. 2017, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 20: Centre for Integrative Biodiversity Research 2021, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 21: William E. Simpson II 2019, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 22: BLM FY22 Tentative WHB Gather Schedule, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 23: AWHC FOIA Consequences of Roundups, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 24: BLM WHB Facilities Report Apr. 2024, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit 25: BLM Litchfield WHB Corrals, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit 26: BLM FOIA Response ORC Death Records, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit 27: BLM Canon City Deaths Report, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit 28: Wild Horse Education Winnemucca ORC Tour, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit 29: 2013 NAS Report, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit 30: 2001 BLM MUD for Twin Peaks, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit 31: Friends of Animals DNA Letter 2024, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit 32: Jesica Johnston 2011, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit 33: BLM 2022 Burro Survey, | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit 34: BLM 2022 Horse Survey, | ||
Att: 39 Exhibit 35: R.T Fitch et al. 2014, | ||
Att: 40 Exhibit 36: BLM Announcement of 2024 Grazing Fees, | ||
Att: 41 Exhibit 37: Craig C. Downer 2014, | ||
Att: 42 Exhibit 38: Craig C. Downer 2019, | ||
Att: 43 Exhibit 39: Craig C. Downer 2018, | ||
Att: 44 Exhibit 40: Craig C. Downer 2022, | ||
Att: 45 Exhibit 41: Craig C. Downer et al. 2013, | ||
Att: 46 Exhibit 42: BLM FY24 WHB Gather Schedule, | ||
Att: 47 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/12 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Best on behalf of FRIENDS OF ANIMALS (Best, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/11 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlyn Faye Cook on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND (Cook, Caitlyn) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/08 9:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Brocker on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND (Brocker, Peter) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 06/28 2:41 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zmtm) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
2 | 2
order
Standing Order
Fri 06/28 2:37 PM
STANDING ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to comply with its Standing Order. See Standing Order for details. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 6/28/2024. (lcar3) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/28 2:33 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zmtm) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/27 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10990139) filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS.(Marcuccio, Andreia) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons BLM, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Deb Haaland, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Matthew Graves, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Merrick Garland |