Brannen v. O'Malley
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Randal Hall |
Referred: | Benjamin W Cheesbro |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00035 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Transcript - Social Security
Mon 08/26 8:18 AM
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings before Social Security Administration.(Warren, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Transcript, | ||
Att: 2 Transcript | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/26 8:17 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Martin J. O'Malley.(Warren, Susan) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/28 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Joan Warren on behalf of Martin J. O'Malley (Warren, Susan) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/27 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Martin J. O'Malley (Statkus, Shannon) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint SS
Thu 06/27 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley (Fee paid $405.00: Receipt #AGASDC-3851710). This Notice of Electronic Filing constitutes service of the Complaint pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions, filed by Laura Brannen. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh) |