USA v. Smith
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Nathaniel M Gorton |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-91340 |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Wed 09/04 1:15 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict (Lima, Christine) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Thu 08/15 6:03 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to September 18, 2024 Responses due by 8/29/2024 (Saltzman, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Wed 07/31 10:14 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict (Lima, Christine) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Thu 07/25 4:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to September 4, 2024 Responses due by 8/8/2024 (Saltzman, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Mon 07/01 4:00 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered granting1 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict and for Excludable Delay. (Lima, Christine) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 06/28 3:05 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Thu 06/27 4:32 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to 8/5/2024 Responses due by 7/11/2024 (Saltzman, Benjamin) |