Camacho Delgado v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Western District Court | |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-06407 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Transcript (Social Security)
Mon 08/26 3:51 PM
TRANSCRIPT (Social Security) .(Myers, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/05 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Myers on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Myers, Lauren) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/03 9:03 AM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore her motion (Dkt. 2) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiff's papers without payment of fees. The service of the complaint has been performed in accordance with WDNY Local Rule 5.5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 7/3/24. (NNR) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/28 11:16 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aura Camacho Delgado.(Spink, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/28 11:31 AM
Case placed in Social Security Pool. (DMK) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/28 11:31 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (DMK) |
||
service
Social Security Appeal Notice re Service
Fri 06/28 11:33 AM
NOTICE regarding service of1 Complaint in a Social Security case: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 8/27/2024. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk issues this Notice of Electronic Filing to the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of New York. No summons will issue. (DMK) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Continuation of Exhibits
Thu 06/27 4:33 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Aura Camacho Delgado. to1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet filed by Aura Camacho Delgado. (Spink, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/27 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Aura Camacho Delgado.(Spink, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B |