McGloon v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth A Wolford |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-06406 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Wed 09/04 2:22 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Patrick John McGloon against Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/24. (JHF) |
|
7 | 7
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Wed 09/04 2:09 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: The Commissioner's final decision is REVERSED pursuant to SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), and the case is REMANDED for further administrative proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment on the complaint in plaintiff's favor and close this case. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 9/4/24. (NNR) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 09/04 1:08 PM
TEXT ORDER reassigning this action to District Judge Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court, on 9/4/2024. (TMK) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Transcript (Social Security)
Thu 08/22 8:27 AM
TRANSCRIPT (Social Security) . (Fernandez, Sixtina) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/28 1:36 PM
TEXT ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore his motion (Dkt. 2) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiff's papers without payment of fees. The service of the complaint has been performed in accordance with WDNY Local Rule 5.5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 6/28/24. (NNR) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/28 7:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sixtina Fernandez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Fernandez, Sixtina) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/27 3:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patrick John McGloon. (Comerford, Ida) Modified on 6/27/2024 (JHF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/27 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Patrick John McGloon. (Comerford, Ida) Modified on 6/27/2024 (JHF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 WITHDRAWL OF CONSENT OF MAGISTRATE | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/27 4:02 PM
Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (JHF) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/27 4:08 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (JHF) |
||
service
Social Security Appeal Notice re Service
Thu 06/27 4:09 PM
NOTICE regarding service of1 Complaint, in a Social Security case: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 8/26/2024. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk issues this Notice of Electronic Filing to the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of New York. No summons will issue. (JHF) |