Hanford Guards Union Local 21 v. Hanford Mission Integration Solutions LLC
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stanley A Bastian |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-05070 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 5:7101 Labor-Management Relations (Findings and Purpose) |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 3:27 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hanford Mission Integration Solutions LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hanford Guards Union Local 21
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 08/07 5:37 PM
DECLARATION by Jackson Millikan in Support re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction compelling arbitration filed by Hanford Guards Union Local 21.(Lemonidis, SaNni) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply Memorandum
Wed 08/07 5:25 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction compelling arbitration filed by Hanford Guards Union Local 21. (Lemonidis, SaNni) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
service
Proof of Service
Mon 08/05 9:25 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by Hanford Guards Union Local 21 re Hanford Mission Integration Solutions LLC. (Lemonidis, SaNni) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Thu 08/01 11:49 PM
DECLARATION by Darrah Hinton in Opposition re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction compelling arbitration filed by Hanford Mission Integration Solutions LLC.(Hinton, Darrah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 08/01 11:46 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction compelling arbitration filed by Hanford Mission Integration Solutions LLC. (Hinton, Darrah) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/29 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter G Finch on behalf of Hanford Mission Integration Solutions LLC (Attorney Peter G Finch added to party Hanford Mission Integration Solutions LLC(pty:dft))(Finch, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Darrah N Hinton on behalf of Hanford Mission Integration Solutions LLC (Attorney Darrah N Hinton added to party Hanford Mission Integration Solutions LLC(pty:dft))(Hinton, Darrah) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Expedite
Thu 07/11 10:09 AM
ORDER DENYING8 MOTION TO EXPEDITE AND RESERVING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (BM, Case Administrator) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 8:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Hanford Mission Integration Solutions LLC. (BM, Case Administrator) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Expedite
Wed 07/10 3:48 PM
MOTION to Expedite Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Hanford Guards Union Local 21. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Streepy, Aaron) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 07/10 3:44 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction compelling arbitration by Hanford Guards Union Local 21. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian.(Streepy, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion to Expedite
Wed 07/03 3:57 PM
ORDER DENYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Denying with leave to refile as a Motion for Preliminary Injunction3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and4 associated Motion to Expedite. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (BM, Case Administrator) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Declaration
Thu 06/27 7:51 PM
DECLARATION of Jackson Millikan re1 Complaint by Hanford Guards Union Local 21.(Streepy, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
4 | 4
motion
Expedite
Thu 06/27 7:45 PM
MOTION to Expedite Motion for TRO by Hanford Guards Union Local 21. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Streepy, Aaron) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 06/27 7:42 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Hanford Guards Union Local 21. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian.(Streepy, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
misc
Declaration
Thu 06/27 4:02 PM
DECLARATION of Jackson Millikan re1 Complaint by Hanford Guards Union Local 21.(Streepy, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/27 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT to compel arbitration against Hanford Mission Integration Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 405; Receipt # AWAEDC-4578216) Filed by Hanford Guards Union of America.(Streepy, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 06/27 4:22 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator) |