Heckl et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03636 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:24-cv-03918 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 6:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Williamplumley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Parsons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nadia Omestaylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Putney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Reeb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Byron Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edgar Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rollinpierre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Rusinyak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Scarborough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Shatraw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Shoudt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Small
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alvin Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Sosa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Spry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Stovall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dimmie Suffridge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Tabor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmie Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Keller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwinroeker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Heckl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Henrickson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Hensley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Theresa Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Herrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lennior Howard, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Humphrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Art Jarvis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Jaynes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Johnson
2031 Leesburg Road
Columbia, SC 29209 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marie Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emily O'Connor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Kempf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Lockhart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lowrypaxton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Luina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Maravolo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark McLain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Montgomery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Nero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elmer Newell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/01 9:39 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 06/27 2:31 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 6/21/2024), 1:24-cv-03918, Heckl et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03636-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 06/27 2:22 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-03918. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/13/2024) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/27/2024.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/27/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/27/2024.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/27/2024.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/27/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet served on All Parties on 5/21/2024. Document filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company), Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually)..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/27/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/27/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152332/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29383232).Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company), Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Chemguard Inc...(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/27/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NY State Court Complaint |