Town of Campbell v. Tyco Fire Products LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03657 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Wisconsin Western, 3:24-cv-00341 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 6:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Town of Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 06/27 4:43 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wisconsin Western (associated as of 6/24/2024), 3:24-cv-00341, Town of Campbell v. Tyco Fire Products LP et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03657-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 06/27 4:39 PM
Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:24-cv-00341. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order . Case closed. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/21/2024. (jls) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/27/2024.] | |
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 Conditional Transfer Order . Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/21/2024. (lam) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/27/2024.] | |
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The stipulation submitted by plaintiff, the Town of Campbell, and two of the named defendants, Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc., to extend the time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Dkt.4 , is accepted as the court's own order: The deadlines for all defendants named in this action to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint shall be as follows: Should the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") decline to transfer this action to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foam Products multidistrict litigation ("AFFF MDL"), defendants shall have 28 days after such disposition by the JPML to answer the complaint in this action. If this action is ultimately transferred to the AFFF MDL, the deadlines for defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint shall be in accordance with the established rules and procedures in the AFFF MDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor on 5/28/2024. (jls) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/27/2024.] | |
4 | 4 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants ChemGuard Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Mette, Bryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/27/2024.] | |
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tyco Fire Products LP. (Bondoc, Evan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/27/2024.] | |
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant ChemGuard Inc.. (Bondoc, Evan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/27/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from La Crosse County Circuit Court, case number 2023CV000465. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWIWDC-3431652), filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, ChemGuard Inc. | |
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents (Bondoc, Evan) Modified on 5/23/2024: Corrected parties with aliases. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/27/2024.] (Entered: 05/23/2024 | ||
Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/27/2024.] | ||
Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/27/2024.] |