Vance v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Gordon P Gallagher |
Referred: | Scott T Varholak |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01807 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 3:40 AM MDT |
Defendant
Humble Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Susan Vance
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Mon 07/29 1:58 PM
ORDER: Given the parties' Notice of Settlement, the Court Orders that either Dismissal Papers, or a Joint Status Report, shall be due by 8/29/2024. The Status Conference which had been set for 8/20/2024 with Judge Varholak is hereby VACATED. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on July 29, 2024. Text Only Entry (gpglc3) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 07/29 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Susan Vance (Dalton, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/02 9:44 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/2/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/13/2024 . Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (schap, ) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/28 11:33 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 6/28/2024. Text Only Entry (schap, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Summons Issued
Fri 06/28 9:32 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (blaws) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 06/28 9:20 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Fri 06/28 9:17 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re:1 Complaint, filed by attorney Richard C. Dalton . DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take: Signature block address mismatch. Counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/27 8:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9752194)Attorney Richard C. Dalton added to party Susan Vance(pty:pla), filed by Susan Vance.(Dalton, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |