Paul Anthony Aquino v. Joseph Biden, Jr. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-05401 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 3:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
Joe Biden
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Biden, Jr
|
|
Plaintiff
Paul Anthony Aquino
3073 Wittenmyer Court
Marina, CA 93933 |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 06/28 4:39 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Request is DENIED. The case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (iv) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 06/27 2:30 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 06/27 2:29 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 06/27 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 06/27 2:24 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Paul Anthony Aquino. (lh) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 06/27 2:14 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paul Anthony Aquino, (lh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 06/27 2:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Paul Anthony Aquino. (lh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |