Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Lashonda A Hunt
Case #: 1:24-cv-05381
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2024
Terminated:Jul 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 2:41 AM CST
Defendant
314 Action Fund
Defendant
Brad Deutsch
Defendant
Joshua Morrow
Defendant
Erik Polyak
Plaintiff
Jorge Alejandro Rojas
557 Cambridge Way
Bolingbrook, IL 60440


Docket last updated: 08/13/2024 12:33 PM CDT
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
1 1 13 pgs RECEIVED Complaint by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. Related [+] (daj, )
Related: [-] ceived via pro se email on 06/27/2024.
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. Related [+] (daj, )
Related: [-] ceived via pro se email on 06/26/2024.
3 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Jorge Alejandro Rojas. Related [+] (daj, )
Related: [-] ceived via pro se email on 06/26/2024.