ABBASPOUR MOTLAGH MOGHADDAM et al v. BLINKEN et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Dabney L Friedrich |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01888 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
RENA BITTER
|
|
Defendant
ANTHONY J. BLINKEN
|
|
Defendant
CHIP LAITINEN
|
|
Plaintiff
MOHAMMAD HOSSEIN ABBASPOUR MOTLAGH MOGHADDAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMIRHOSSEIN GHOLAMI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALI KHANZAMANI MOHAMMADI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HOSSEIN MAHMOODIAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NEGIN MAHMOUDI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PARASTOO PILEVAR
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Tue 09/03 1:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by RENA BITTER, ANTONY BLINKEN, CHIP LAITINEN.(Carilli, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/03 6:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Carilli, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 08/27 5:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiff filed the complaint in this action on June 28, 2024, against three defendants. As of today, the public docket reflects that the plaintiff has not filed proof of service of any defendant. The Court directs the plaintiff's attention to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), which provides in pertinent part that if a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court, on motion or on its own after notice to the plaintiff, must dismiss the action without prejudice against that defendant or order that service be made within a specified time. But if the plaintiff shows good cause for the failure, the court must extend the time for service for an appropriate period. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Unless service is waived, proof of service must be made to the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l)(1). To avoid the finality of a mandatory dismissal of this action against the defendants, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff must, on or before September 26, 2024, either cause process to be served upon the defendants and proof of service to be filed with the Court or establish good cause for the failure to do so. The failure to make such filings will result in dismissal of this case. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 27, 2024. (lcdlf3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/30 12:43 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Time to effectuate service upon party due by 9/26/2024. (zjch, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
order
.Order
Wed 07/03 2:17 PM
STANDARD ORDER. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 1, 2024. (lcdlf3) |
|
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Wed 07/03 9:13 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Mon 07/01 11:41 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by PARASTOO PILEVAR, ALI KHANZAMANI MOHAMMADI, AMIRHOSSEIN GHOLAMI, MOHAMMAD HOSSEIN ABBASPOUR MOTLAGH MOGHADDAM, HOSSEIN MAHMOODIAN, NEGIN MAHMOUDI. Related document:1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus,,,,,, filed by MOHAMMAD HOSSEIN ABBASPOUR MOTLAGH MOGHADDAM, Notice of Error- New Case,.(Aramesh, Arash) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 07/01 8:56 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to RENA BITTER, ANTHONY J. BLINKEN, CHIP LAITINEN.(zmtm) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/01 8:51 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmtm) |
||
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Mon 07/01 8:58 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus,,,,,,. The following error(s) need correction: Missing summonses- U.S. government. When naming a U.S. government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmtm) |
||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Fri 06/28 10:35 AM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10991342) filed by MOHAMMAD HOSSEIN ABBASPOUR MOTLAGH MOGHADDAM.(Aramesh, Arash) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT AA, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT BB, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT CC, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit EXHIBIT DD, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit EXHIBIT EE, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit EXHIBIT FF, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit EXHIBIT GG, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit EXHIBIT H, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit EXHIBIT H, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit EXHIBIT II, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit EXHIBIT II, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit EXHIBIT J, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit EXHIBIT JJ, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit EXHIBIT K, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit EXHIBIT KK, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit EXHIBIT L, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit EXHIBIT LL, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit EXHIBIT M, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit EXHIBIT MM, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit EXHIBIT N, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit EXHIBIT NN, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit EXHIBIT O, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit EXHIBIT OO, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit EXHIBIT PP, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit EXHIBIT Q, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit EXHIBIT QQ, | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit EXHIBIT R, | ||
Att: 39 Exhibit EXHIBIT RR, | ||
Att: 40 Exhibit EXHIBIT S, | ||
Att: 41 Exhibit EXHIBIT SS, | ||
Att: 42 Exhibit EXHIBIT T, | ||
Att: 43 Exhibit EXHIBIT TT, | ||
Att: 44 Exhibit EXHIBIT U, | ||
Att: 45 Exhibit EXHIBIT UU, | ||
Att: 46 Exhibit EXHIBIT V, | ||
Att: 47 Exhibit EXHIBIT VV, | ||
Att: 48 Exhibit EXHIBIT W, | ||
Att: 49 Exhibit EXHIBIT WW, | ||
Att: 50 Exhibit EXHIBIT X, | ||
Att: 51 Exhibit EXHIBIT XX, | ||
Att: 52 Exhibit EXHIBIT Y, | ||
Att: 53 Exhibit EXHIBIT Z |