Ellis v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 0:15-md-02666
Lead case: 0:15-md-02666
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02498 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 3:34 AM CDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/08 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W. Hulse on behalf of All Defendants. (Hulse, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel to Comply with Pretrial Orders in Main MDL Case
Fri 06/28 9:52 AM
(Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file IN RE: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . (MMP) |
|
4 | 4
order
MDL Pretrial Order
Fri 06/28 9:51 AM
MDL PRETRIAL ORDER NO 1. Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016.(MMP) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/28 9:50 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (MMP) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 06/28 9:50 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-2498 (JNE/DTS). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/28 9:41 AM
COMPLAINT Edward Ellis against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11161561) filed by Edward Ellis. Filer requests summons issued. (Assaad, Gabriel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |