Julio Cruz v. Lees Mattress, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-01434 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 1:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Lees Mattress, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julio Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Statement
Mon 08/26 4:41 PM
STATEMENT re: Order Granting Application for Stay and Early Mediation filed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz re: Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)11 . (Kim, Jason) |
|
12 | 12
order
Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22)
Mon 08/26 10:19 AM
FOR COURT USE ONLY: STATISTICAL CORRECTION Granting10 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation re11 Order to ADR Procedure (es) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Mon 08/12 4:16 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than November 12, 2024. (es) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21)
Wed 07/31 9:57 AM
First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by defendant Lees Mattress, Inc.. (Attorney Phillip Bao Nghiem added to party Lees Mattress, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Nghiem, Phillip) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 07/19 9:50 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz, upon Defendant Lees Mattress, Inc. served on 7/17/2024, answer due 8/7/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon HONG NGUYEN, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 07/16 9:31 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz, upon Defendant Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC served on 7/15/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon BEDIIG ARARADIAN, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 07/03 10:55 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: See document for details and deadlines. (es) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 07/02 9:27 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, Lees Mattress, Inc. (et) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Tue 07/02 9:26 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) |
|
Att: 1 CV11C Statement of Consent | ||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 06/28 1:14 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 06/28 1:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 06/28 1:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/28 1:07 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-37743249 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Julio Cruz(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |