Greene v. Sanofi US Services Inc., et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01665 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Donna Greene
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Terminated: 07/12/2024
|
|
Defendant
Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Terminated: 07/12/2024
|
|
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
Terminated: 07/12/2024
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
Terminated: 07/12/2024
|
|
Defendant
Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Terminated: 07/12/2024
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Fri 07/05 3:26 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(my) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/01 11:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(gla) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons | ||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 06/28 4:30 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (meb) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/28 3:08 PM
NOTICE by Donna Greene re1 Complaint,, Notice of Designated Forum - District of South Carolina . (Paul, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/28 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC f/k/a Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10592022) filed by Donna Greene.Attorney Richard M. Paul, III added to party Donna Greene(pty:pla).(Paul, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons |