Howell v. Commissioner of Social Security
North Carolina Western District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth D Bell |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00180 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice/Substitution of Appearance - Commissioner
Wed 08/28 9:57 AM
NOTICE OF Appearance by Natasha McKay appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. (McKay, Natasha) |
||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
order
Social Security Scheduling Order (NEW)
Tue 08/27 9:46 AM
TEXT-ONLY Social Security Scheduling Order. It Appearing to the Court that the Defendant Commissioner has filed an answer and/or the administrative record herein, the issues are ripe for this Court's review. Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions and Local Civil Rule 7.2, the Plaintiff's Brief shall be due within 30 days. The Defendant Commissioner's Brief shall be due 30 days after service of the Plaintiff's SS Brief. The Plaintiff may file a Reply Brief within 14 days of the Defendant Commissioner's Brief. Plaintiff SS Brief due by 9/26/2024. Entered by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 8/27/2024. (mek) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint Administrative Record/Answer - Social Security
Mon 08/26 3:29 PM
Administrative Record - Social Security, ANSWER to1 Complaint(McKay, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1 part 2, | ||
Att: 2 part 3, | ||
Att: 3 part 4, | ||
Att: 4 part 5, | ||
Att: 5 part 6, | ||
Att: 6 part 7, | ||
Att: 7 part 8, | ||
Att: 8 part 9 | ||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/28 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security *( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6575095), filed by Norris Howell.(Piemonte, George) Modified *text on 6/28/2024. NEF Regenerated (ejb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/28 4:09 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb) |
||
notice
Notice: Social Security Case Service
Fri 06/28 4:17 PM
Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3; The Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. (ejb) |
||
notice
Notice to Answer SSA Complaint
Fri 06/28 4:20 PM
Notice to answer Social Security Complaint: Answer due from Commissioner of the Social Security Administration on or by 60 days from the filing of this notice. (Commissioner of Social Security answer due 8/27/2024.) (ejb) |