Clopton v. 3M Company Inc et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03754 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 5:24-cv-00758 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 5:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Toray Fluorofibers (America) Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Larry Clopton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 09/06 7:30 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs As to Entire Case Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-03754-RMG(Earley, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Tue 08/27 10:01 AM
Letter from Plaintiffs re Notice of Pending Motions to Remand. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Earley, Jason) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 06/28 3:10 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 6/28/2024), 5:24-cv-00758, Clopton v. 3M Company Inc et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03754-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
12 | 12
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 06/28 3:04 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 5:24-cv-00758. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/28 12:10 PM
ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the7 Motion to stay deadlines. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/24/2024. (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/28/2024.] | |
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A Burkhart on behalf of Daikin America Inc (Burkhart, Charles) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/28/2024.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R DeBray, Jr on behalf of Daikin America Inc (DeBray, Thomas) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/28/2024.] | |
7 | 7 JOINT MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Daikin America Inc. (DeBray, Thomas) Modified on 6/21/2024 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/28/2024.] | |
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart on behalf of Daikin America Inc (Flachsbart, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/28/2024.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen M Estes on behalf of Daikin America Inc (Estes, Allen) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/28/2024.] | |
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L Yeilding on behalf of Daikin America Inc (Yeilding, Christopher) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/28/2024.] | |
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Larry Clopton.(Earley, Jason) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/28/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of C. Randolph, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. Light Water Brochure, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3. 3M 10-Q, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4. Patent Application, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5. Darwin Transcript, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6. MIL-F 24385, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7. Rog Responses, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8. Tire Specs, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9. Military Specs, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10. Wire Specs, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11. Wire Ad | ||
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4612326 (B-12000). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company Inc from Circuit Court of Morgan County, Alabama, case number 52-CV-2024-900232 filed by 3M Company Inc.(AHI). (Radney, W) Modified on 6/11/2024 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/28/2024.] | ||
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company Inc (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/28/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company Inc from Circuit Court of Morgan County, Alabama, case number 52-CV-2024-900232 filed by 3M Company Inc.(AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/28/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |