McKinney v. Warden of FCI Pekin
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Darrow |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01234 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 09/04 10:23 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 9/4/2024: Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Petition4 is DENIED. Petitioner's case was closed on August 16, 2024, for failure to pay the filing fee. No fee has been received to date. Petitioner may file a new Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2241 along with the $5.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed in forma pauperis if he wishes to pursue his claims. (BMG) |
||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 09/03 1:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition by Petitioner James McKinney. Responses due by 9/17/2024. (BMG) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Judgment
Fri 08/16 11:04 AM
JUDGMENT entered. (BMG) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241 & 2254) ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 08/16 8:51 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/16/2024: Pursuant to the Court's July 1, 2024 Text Order, Petitioner was ordered to pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 30 days. He has failed to do so. Accordingly, his Petition1 is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. All pending motions are moot. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case.(BMG) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 07/15 1:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Amend Petition by Petitioner James McKinney. Responses due by 7/29/2024 (JMB) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/01 9:01 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/1/2024: Petitioner has filed a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2241, but he has not paid the $5.00 filing fee. If Petitioner is unable to pay the required filing fee, he may file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to pay the required filing fee or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 30 days, his Section 2254 Petition will be dismissed without prejudice by this Court.(BMG) |
||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241 & 2254)
Fri 06/28 2:18 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James McKinney.(BMG) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits |