Kong v. Mayorkas et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-05135 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 3:28 AM CDT |
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation
|
|
Defendant
Attorney General Merrick B. Garland
|
|
Defendant
Director Marie Hummert
|
|
Defendant
Director Ur Jaddou
|
|
Defendant
Director Kenneth Madsen
|
|
Defendant
Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
|
|
Plaintiff
Fanhong Kong
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stay
Wed 09/11 3:34 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Merrick B. Garland, Marie Hummert, Ur Jaddou, Kenneth Madsen, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Creed, Seth) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 07/11 7:50 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Kenneth Madsen, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Requested
Wed 07/10 4:59 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Kenneth Madsen for service of the following document: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Complaint. (Bogart, Nathan) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 07/03 4:37 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Requested
Wed 07/03 4:23 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Alejandro Mayorkas for service of the following document: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Complaint.(Bogart, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Supplement Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Supplement Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Supplement Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Supplement Summons | ||
4 | 4
misc
Refund of Fees Paid
Wed 07/03 9:21 AM
REQUEST FOR REFUND OF FEES PAID with Pay.gov Tracking ID AARWDC-3008954 and Receipt Number 4987612 by Fanhong Kong. (Bogart, Nathan) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Mon 07/01 11:05 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/01 10:10 AM
COMPLAINT Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-3008962), filed by Fanhong Kong.(Bogart, Nathan) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 06/28 4:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Fanhong Kong. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (bjb) |