Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas M Horan |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-11442 |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.
132 E Putnam Ave Fl 2W
Cos Cob, CT 06807-2744 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
91 | 91
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 07/05 7:55 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Maxim B. Litvak . Receipt Number 4351740, Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Golden, Steven) |
|
90 | 90
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 07/05 7:53 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Alan J. Kornfeld . Receipt Number 4445258, Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Golden, Steven) |
|
89 | 89
notice
Appearance - Notice
Fri 07/05 7:36 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (O'Neill, James) |
|
88 | 88
trustee
Telephonic 341 Meeting Information
Fri 07/05 3:58 PM
The upcoming 341(a) meeting is scheduled to be held by phone. Please call 888-455-8838 and use access code 1277570, followed by a # sign to join the meeting. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Leamy, Jane) |
|
87 | 87
misc
Request to Schedule Section 341 Meeting
Fri 07/05 3:56 PM
Request of US Trustee to Schedule Section 341 Meeting of Creditors for Friday August 2, 2024 at 12:00 p.m. ET Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Leamy, Jane) |
|
86 | 86
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 07/05 2:37 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Cathy A. Hinger, Esq . Receipt Number 4445011, Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC. (Patterson, Morgan) |
|
Thursday, July 04, 2024 | ||
85 | 85
50
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/04 9:24 AM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (B) Use Cash Collateral, and (C) Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to Certain Prepetition Secured Parties, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (V) Granting Related Relief Order Signed on 7/4/2024. (AMH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
84 | 84
3
pgs
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 07/03 9:51 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Further Revised Proposed Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (B) Use Cash Collateral, and (C) Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to Certain Prepetition Secured Parties, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
Att: 1 70 pgs Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 73 pgs Exhibit B | ||
83 | 83
2
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Wed 07/03 5:20 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Lubbock Central Appraisal District. (Monroe, Laura) |
|
82 | 82
1
pgs
audio
Wed 07/03 3:45 PM
Court Date & Time [07/03/2024 11:01:14 AM]. File Size [ 4554 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:19:43 ]. (Second Half). (admin) |
|
81 | 81
1
pgs
audio
Wed 07/03 3:40 PM
Court Date & Time [07/03/2024 11:01:14 AM]. File Size [ 8089 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:35:08 ]. (admin) |
|
80 | 80
1
pgs
order
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 07/03 12:41 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Marc A. Lebowitz, Esq. Order Signed on 7/3/2024. (AMH) |
|
79 | 79
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Wed 07/03 11:43 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Marc A. Lebowitz . Receipt Number 4443985, Filed by Capella International, Inc.. (Leonhardt, Scott) |
|
78 | 78
8
pgs
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Wed 07/03 1:01 AM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/3/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
77 | 77
2
pgs
misc
Exhibit
Wed 07/03 12:53 AM
Exhibit(s) - Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (B) Use Cash Collateral, and (C) Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to Certain Prepetition Secured Parties, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
Att: 1 65 pgs Exhibit A (Revised Proposed Interim Order) | ||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
76 | 76
1
pgs
audio
Tue 07/02 4:55 PM
Court Date & Time [07/02/2024 03:00:26 PM]. File Size [ 18698 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:21:31 ]. (Continued Hearing). (admin). Modified on 7/2/2024 (IJW) |
|
75 | 75
6
pgs
order
Motion to Pay Employee Wages
Tue 07/02 4:45 PM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Reimbursable Expenses, and Other Obligations on Account of Compensation and Benefits Programs and (B) Continue Compensation and Benefits Programs; and (II) Granting Related Relief Order Signed on 7/2/2024. (AMH) |
|
74 | 74
1
pgs
audio
Tue 07/02 4:45 PM
Court Date & Time [07/02/2024 09:00:19 AM]. File Size [ 3933 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:55 ]. (admin) |
|
73 | 73
7
pgs
order
Joint Administration Order
Tue 07/02 3:59 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment Inc., et al. The docket in Case No. 24-11442 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 7/2/2024. (AMH) |
|
72 | 72
2
pgs
answer
Response
Tue 07/02 3:03 PM
Response // Response of William Rouhana to Motion to Shorten Notice on HPS Partners LLC's Motion to (I) Reconstitute the Debtors' Boards of Directors and Strategic Review Committees, or, in the Alternative, (II) Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, or in the Alternative, (III) Convert the Chapter 11 Cases to Chapter 7 Liquidation Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, William Rouhana (Patterson, Morgan) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
71 | 71
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 07/02 1:05 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Broward County. (Andron, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Local Form 105a | ||
70 | 70
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 07/02 11:37 AM
Certificate of Service Regarding HPS Investment Partners, LLCs Motion to (I) Reconstitute the Debtors Board of Directors and Strategic Review Committees, or, in the Alternative, (II) Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, or, in the Alternative, (III) Convert the Chapter 11 Cases to Chapter 7 Liquidation [Docket No. 29] and HPS Investment Partners, LLCs Motion for Entry of an Order Shortening Notice and Objection Periods with Respect to HPS Investment Partners, LLCs Motion to (I) Reconstitute the Debtors Board of Directors and Strategic Review Committees, or, in the Alternative, (II) Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, or, in the Alternative, (III) Convert the Chapter 11 Cases to Chapter 7 Liquidation [Docket No. 30] Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. (Mathews, Emily) |
|
69 | 69
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 07/02 11:34 AM
Certificate of Service Regarding HPS Investment Partners, LLCs Omnibus Objection to the Debtors DIP Motion, Cash Management Motion, Management Services Fee Motion, and Wages Motion Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. (Mathews, Emily) |
|
68 | 68
misc
Request for Service of Notices
Tue 07/02 10:31 AM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by ManpowerGroup Talent Solutions, LLC. (Wisotzkey, Samuel) |
|
67 | 67
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 07/02 9:37 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Montgomery County, Jefferson County, Galveston County, Texas City ISD, Fort Bend County, Cypress-Fairbanks ISD. (Grundemeier, Tara) |
|
66 | 66
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 07/02 9:21 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Claire J. Rauscher, Esq. Order Signed on 7/2/2024. (AMH) |
|
65 | 65
8
pgs
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Tue 07/02 8:23 AM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2024 at 09:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
64 | 64
5
pgs
answer
Objection
Tue 07/02 8:19 AM
Objection // Debtors Objection to Motion to Shorten Notice on HPS Partners LLCs Motion to (i) Reconstitute the Debtors Boards of Directors and Strategic Review Committees, or, in the Alternative, (ii) Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, or, in the Alternative, (iii) Convert the Chapter 11 Cases to Chapter 7 Liquidation Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
63 | 63
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 07/02 7:59 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Claire J. Rauscher, Esq . Receipt Number 4442670, Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, William Rouhana. (Patterson, Morgan) |
|
62 | 62
3
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 07/02 7:49 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, William Rouhana. (Patterson, Morgan) |
|
61 | 61
claims
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
Tue 07/02 12:07 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Mason Gavilan Regarding Amended Notice of Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for July 2, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. (prevailing Eastern Time), before the Honorable Thomas M. Horan at the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, Located at 824 North Market Street, 3rd Floor, Wilmington, Delaware 19801 . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Malo, David) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Tue 07/02 7:56 AM
Attorney Cathy A. Hinger and Morgan L. Patterson for Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC and William Rouhana, Claire J Rauscher and Morgan L. Patterson for Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC and William Rouhana added to case Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul, LLC, William Rouhana. (Patterson, Morgan) |
||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
60 | 60
notice
Appearance - Notice
Mon 07/01 5:25 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by City of El Paso. (Stecker, Don) |
|
59 | 59
claims
Request for Service of Notices
Mon 07/01 5:18 PM
Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Dallas County, Tarrant County. (Turner, John) |
|
58 | 58
answer
Objection
Mon 07/01 4:37 PM
Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights to Debtors' DIP / Cash Collateral Motion Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension and Health Plans, Motion Picture Industry Pension and Health Plans, Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, Screen Actors Guild-Producers Pension Plan and SAG-AFTRA Health Plan, Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund and Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan (Kaufman, Susan) |
|
57 | 57
7
pgs
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Mon 07/01 4:00 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2024 at 09:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
56 | 56
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 3:54 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Kirk M. Prestegard, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
55 | 55
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 3:50 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of David E. Ahdoot, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
54 | 54
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 3:46 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Joseph A. Kohanski, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
53 | 53
misc
Request for Service of Notices
Mon 07/01 3:09 PM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by Texas Taxing Entities Represented by McCreary, Veselka, Bragg & Allen. (Parsons, Julie) |
|
52 | 52
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 12:37 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Kirk M. Prestegard . Receipt Number 4441908, Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension and Health Plans, Motion Picture Industry Pension and Health Plans, Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, Screen Actors Guild-Producers Pension Plan and SAG-AFTRA Health Plan, Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund and Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan. (Kaufman, Susan) |
|
51 | 51
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 12:34 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of David E. Ahdoot . Receipt Number 4441908, Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension and Health Plans, Motion Picture Industry Pension and Health Plans, Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, Screen Actors Guild-Producers Pension Plan and SAG-AFTRA Health Plan, Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund and Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan. (Kaufman, Susan) |
|
50 | 50
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 12:32 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Joseph A. Kohanski . Receipt Number 4441908, Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension and Health Plans, Motion Picture Industry Pension and Health Plans, Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, Screen Actors Guild-Producers Pension Plan and SAG-AFTRA Health Plan, Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund and Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan. (Kaufman, Susan) |
|
49 | 49
notice
Appearance - Notice
Mon 07/01 12:23 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Motion Picture Industry Pension and Health Plans, Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund and Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Screen Actors Guild-Producers Pension Plan and SAG-AFTRA Health Plan, Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension and Health Plans, Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, Directors Guild of America, Inc.. (Kaufman, Susan) |
|
48 | 48
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 12:07 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Shanna M. Kaminski, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
47 | 47
notice
Appearance - Notice
Mon 07/01 11:57 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Canon Financial Services, Inc.. (Suglia, Nicola) |
|
46 | 46
audio
Mon 07/01 11:55 AM
Court Date & Time [07/01/2024 10:01:36 AM]. File Size [ 8083 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:55 ]. (admin) |
|
45 | 45
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 11:41 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Shanna M. Kaminski of Kaminski Law, PLLC . Receipt Number 4441911, Filed by Cedar advance. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
44 | 44
crditcrd
none
Mon 07/01 11:35 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11442 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number 10095038, amount $1738.00. (COH) |
|
43 | 43
answer
Objection
Mon 07/01 9:54 AM
Objection of MidCap Financial Trust to Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Under 11 USC §§ 105, 361, 362, 363 and 364 (I) Authorizing the Debtors, on a Final and Interim Basis, to (A) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (B) Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims to Post Petition Lenders, and (C) Utilize Cash Collateral; (II) Providing Adequate Protection to the Pre-Petition Secured Parties; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; (IV) Granting Related Relief Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 363, 364 and 507; and (V) Scheduling a Final Hearing Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and Local Rule 4001-2; and (VI) Granting Related Relief Filed by MidCap Financial Trust (Merola, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
42 | 42
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 9:49 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Ian M. Turetsky, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
41 | 41
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 9:46 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Jordan W. Siev, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
40 | 40
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 9:44 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Luke A. Sizemore, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
39 | 39
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 9:39 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Michael P. Cooley, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
38 | 38
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 9:35 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of S. Robert Marsters, Jr., Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
37 | 37
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 9:32 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Matthew Brod, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
36 | 36
court
Standing Order/Transcripts
Mon 07/01 9:29 AM
The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Reliable Companies . Telephone number 302-654-8080 .. |
|
35 | 35
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 9:27 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Danielle Lee Sauer, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
34 | 34
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 9:22 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Dennis F. Dunne, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
33 | 33
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 9:20 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Brett Lowe, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
32 | 32
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 9:18 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Andrew M. Leblanc, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
31 | 31
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 9:05 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Paul J. Laurin, Esq. Order Signed on 7/1/2024. (AMH) |
|
30 | 30
6
pgs
motion
Shorten - Motion
Mon 07/01 4:07 AM
Motion to Shorten (HPS Investment Partners, LLCs Motion for Entry of an Order Shortening Notice and Objection Periods with Respect to HPS Partners LLSs Motion to (I) Reconstitute the Debtors' Boards of Directors and Strategic Review Committees, or, in the Alternative, (II) Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, or, in the Alternative, (III) Convert the Chapter 11 Cases to Chapter 7 Liquidation) Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. (Silberglied, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A | ||
29 | 29
48
pgs
motion
Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee - Motion
Mon 07/01 3:59 AM
Motion for Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee (Motion of HPS Investment Partners, LLC to (I) Reconstitute the Debtors Board of Directors and Strategic Review Committees, or, in the Alternative, (II) Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee, or, in the Alternative, (III) Convert the Chapter 11 Cases to Chapter 7 Liquidation) Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/1/2024 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/1/2024. (Silberglied, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K | ||
28 | 28
answer
Objection
Mon 07/01 1:14 AM
Objection (HPS Investment Partners, LLCs Omnibus Objection to the Debtors' DIP Motion, Cash Management Motion, Management Services Fee Motion, and Wages Motion) Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC (Silberglied, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
27 | 27
6
pgs
answer
Objection
Mon 07/01 12:25 AM
Objection /Preliminary Objection of Cedar Advance LLC to Debtors' Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Cedar advance (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Agreement) | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (UCC Financing Statement) | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Unreported Opinion) | ||
26 | 26
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 12:06 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of S. Robert Marsters, Jr. of Milbank LLP . Receipt Number 4441538, Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. (Silberglied, Russell) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 12:04 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Matthew Brod of Milbank LLP . Receipt Number 4441537, Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. (Silberglied, Russell) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 12:03 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Danielle Lee Sauer of Milbank LLP . Receipt Number 4441537, Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. (Silberglied, Russell) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Mon 07/01 12:17 AM
Attorney Dennis F Dunne and Russell C. Silberglied for HPS Investment Partners, LLC, Matthew L. Brod and Russell C. Silberglied for HPS Investment Partners, LLC, Andrew M. Leblanc and Russell C. Silberglied for HPS Investment Partners, LLC, Brett Philip Lowe and Russell C. Silberglied for HPS Investment Partners, LLC, S. Roberts Marsters, Jr. and Russell C. Silberglied for HPS Investment Partners, LLC, Danielle Lee Sauer and Russell C. Silberglied for HPS Investment Partners, LLC, Mark D. Collins and Russell C. Silberglied for HPS Investment Partners, LLC, Emily Rae Mathews and Russell C. Silberglied for HPS Investment Partners, LLC, Alexander R. Steiger and Russell C. Silberglied for HPS Investment Partners, LLC added to case Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. (Silberglied, Russell) |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Mon 07/01 12:27 PM
Attorney David E Ahdoot and Susan E. Kaufman for Motion Picture Industry Pension and Health Plans; Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists; Screen Actors Guild-Producers Pension Plan and SAG-AFTRA Health Plan; Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.; Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund and Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan; Directors Guild of America, Inc. and Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension and Health Plans, Joseph A. Kohanski and Susan E. Kaufman for Motion Picture Industry Pension and Health Plans; Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists; Screen Actors Guild-Producers Pension Plan and SAG-AFTRA Health Plan; Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.; Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund and Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan; Directors Guild of America, Inc. and Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension and Health Plans, Kirk Prestegard and Susan E. Kaufman for Motion Picture Industry Pension and Health Plans; Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists; Screen Actors Guild-Producers Pension Plan and SAG-AFTRA Health Plan; Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.; Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund and Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan; Directors Guild of America, Inc. and Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension and Health Plans added to case Filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension and Health Plans, Motion Picture Industry Pension and Health Plans, Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, Screen Actors Guild-Producers Pension Plan and SAG-AFTRA Health Plan, Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund and Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan. (Kaufman, Susan) |
||
Sunday, June 30, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 07/01 12:00 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Dennis F. Dunne of Milbank LLP . Receipt Number 4441537, Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. (Silberglied, Russell) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Sun 06/30 11:58 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Brett Lowe of Milbank LLP . Receipt Number 4441537, Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. (Silberglied, Russell) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Sun 06/30 11:57 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Andrew M. Leblanc of Milbank LLP . Receipt Number 4441537, Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. (Silberglied, Russell) |
|
20 | 20
4
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Sun 06/30 11:53 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by HPS Investment Partners, LLC. (Silberglied, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
19 | 19
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Sun 06/30 8:53 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Paul J. Laurin . Receipt Number 4439112, Filed by Owlpoint Capital Management LLC, Owlpoint IP Opportunities JVF I LP. (Collins, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Sun 06/30 8:48 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Owlpoint IP Opportunities JVF I LP, Owlpoint Capital Management LLC. (Collins, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
17 | 17
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Sun 06/30 5:10 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Ian M. Turetsky of Reed Smith LLP . Receipt Number ADEDC-4441, Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Eckard, Mark) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Sun 06/30 5:09 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Jordan W. Siev of Reed Smith LLP . Receipt Number ADEDC-4441, Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Eckard, Mark) |
|
15 | 15
claims
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
Sun 06/30 3:51 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Selwyn Perry Regarding Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 521 Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs, Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Reimbursable Expenses, and Other Obligations on Account of Compensation and Benefits Programs and (B) Continue Compensation and Benefits Programs; and (II) Granting Related Relief, Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, and Business Forms and Payment of Related Prepetition Obligations; (II) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. § 345(b); (III) Authorizing Continued Performance of Intercompany Transfers; and (IV) Granting Related Relief, Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) File a Consolidated List of Creditors in Lieu of Submitting a Separate Mailing Matrix for each Debtor, (B) File a Consolidated List of the Debtors Thirty Largest Unsecured Creditors, and (C) Redact or Withhold Publication of Certain Personally Identifiable Information, (II) Extending the Time for the Debtors to File a Consolidated List of Creditors; (III) Approving the Master Service List, (IV) Waiving Requirement to File the List of Equity Holders, and (V) Granting Related Relief, Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Joint Administration of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases, Declaration of William J. Rouhana, Jr., Chairman of The Board, In Support of Debtors Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Motions, Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 363 and 364 (I) Authorizing the Debtors, on a Final and Interim Basis, to (A) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (B) Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims to Post-Petition Lenders, and (C) Utilize Cash Collateral; (II) Providing Adequate Protection to the Pre-Petition Secured Parties; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; (IV) Granting Related Relief; and (V) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (VI) Granting Related Relief, Debtors Application for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Retention and Appointment of Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC as the Claims and Noticing Agent Effective as of the Petition Date, and (II) Granting Related Relief, Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Continue Ordinary Course Business Relationship Under Management Services Agreement and License Agreement with Parent Company, Notice of Filing of Chapter 11 Petitions and Related Motions and Declarations, and Notice of Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for July 1, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (prevailing Eastern Time), Before the Honorable Thomas M. Horan at the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, Located at 824 North Market Street, 3rd Floor, Wilmington, Delaware 19801 . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Malo, David) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Sun 06/30 3:09 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Luke A. Sizemore of Reed Smith LLP . Receipt Number ADEDC-4441, Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Eckard, Mark) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Sun 06/30 2:38 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael P. Cooley of Reed Smith LLP . Receipt Number ADEDC-4351, Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Eckard, Mark) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Sun 06/30 8:50 PM
Attorney Paul J. Laurin and Kevin G. Collins for Owlpoint Capital Management LLC and Owlpoint IP Opportunities JVF I LP, Kevin G. Collins and Kevin G. Collins for Owlpoint Capital Management LLC and Owlpoint IP Opportunities JVF I LP added to case Filed by Owlpoint Capital Management LLC, Owlpoint IP Opportunities JVF I LP. (Collins, Kevin) |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Sun 06/30 11:28 PM
Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Leamy, Jane) |
||
Saturday, June 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
7
pgs
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice
Sat 06/29 8:34 PM
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/1/2024 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Exhibit
Sat 06/29 7:46 PM
Exhibit(s) - Notice of Filing of First Day Petitions and Related Motions and Delectation Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Allow - Motion
Sat 06/29 6:53 PM
Motion to Allow - Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Continue Ordinary Course Business Relationship Under Management Services Agreement and License Agreement with Parent Company Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
9 | 9
15
pgs
motion
Employ/Retain - Application/Motion
Sat 06/29 6:02 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC as claims and noticing agent Filed By Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.(Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 11 pgs Exhibit C | ||
8 | 8
38
pgs
motion
Approve Use of Cash Collateral - Motion
Sat 06/29 2:30 AM
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral //Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 363 and 364 (I) Authorizing the Debtors, on a Final and Interim Basis, to (A) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (B) Grant Liens And Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims To Post-Petition Lenders, And (C) Utilize Cash Collateral; (II) Providing Adequate Protection To The Pre-Petition Secured Parties; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; (IV) Granting Related Relief, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105, 361, 362, 363, 364 And 507; and (V) Scheduling a Final Hearing Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and Local Rule 4001-2; and (VI) Granting Related Relief Filed By Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.(Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
19
pgs
first
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion
Sat 06/29 2:27 AM
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion //Declaration of William J. Rouhana, Jr., Chairman of the Board, In Support of Debtors' Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Motions Filed By Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Sat 06/29 1:51 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by 757 Film Acquisition LLC, CSS AVOD Inc., CSSESIG, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc., Chicken Soup for the Soul Studios, LLC, Chicken Soup for the Soul Television Group, LLC, Crackle Plus, LLC, Digital Media Enterprises LLC, Halcyon Studios, LLC, Halcyon Television, LLC, Landmark Studio Group LLC, Locomotive Global, Inc., Pivotshare, Inc., RB Second Merger Sub LLC, Redbox Automated Retail, LLC, Redbox Entertainment, LLC, Redbox Holdings, LLC, Redbox Incentives LLC, Redwood Intermediate, LLC, Screen Media Films, LLC, Screen Media Ventures, LLC, TOFG LLC. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Approve - Motion
Sat 06/29 1:41 AM
Motion to Approve //Motion for Entry of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtors To (A) File a Consolidated List of Creditors in Lieu of Submitting a Separate Mailing Matrix for Each Debtor, (B) File a Consolidated List of the Debtors Thirty Largest Unsecured Creditors, and (C) Redact or Withhold Publication of Certain Personally Identifiable Information, (II) Extending the Time for the Debtors to File a Consolidated List of Creditors; (III) Approving the Master Service List, (IV) Waiving Requirement to File the List Of Equity Holders, and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Sat 06/29 1:36 AM
Motion to Approve //Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, and Business Forms and Payment of Related Prepetition Obligations; (II) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. §345(b); (III) Authorizing Continued Performance of Intercompany Transfers; and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Interim Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Final Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - List of Bank Accounts | ||
3 | 3
40
pgs
motion
Motion to Pay Employee Wages
Sat 06/29 1:33 AM
Motion to Pay Employee Wages //Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Reimbursable Expenses, and Other Obligations on Account of Compensation and Benefits Programs and (B) Continue Compensation and Benefits Programs; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.(Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Interim Order | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit B - Proposed Final Order | ||
2 | 2
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules - Motion
Sat 06/29 1:30 AM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Palacio, Ricardo) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
court
Case Assigned
Sat 06/29 11:56 AM
Judge Thomas M Horan added to case (SH) |
||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
28
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 06/28 11:45 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Chicken Soup for the Soul Entertainment, Inc.. (Palacio, Ricardo) |