Zapata v. Discover et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John L Badalamenti |
Referred: | Kyle C Dudek |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00587 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 6:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
Discover
|
|
Defendant
Representatives
|
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Randy Zapata
1504 Rita Avenue S
Lehigh Acres, FL 33976 |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 09/04 3:03 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by Randy Zapata. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 9/4/2024. (CGW) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 08/12 4:04 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. Plaintiff Dr. Randy Zapata has failed to respond to the Court's prior order 6 as directed. Out of an abundance of caution, Zapata is given until 8/30/2024 to SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's order. Zapata can alternatively satisfy this show cause order by filing a completed long-form application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs (AO Form 239) or paying the filing the fee. If Plaintiff again does neither, the undersigned will recommend that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 8/12/2024. (DM) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Recusal
Fri 07/26 3:31 PM
Second MOTION for Recusal by Randy Zapata.(JTM) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Attachment 2, | ||
Att: 3 Mailing Envelope | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Recusal
Thu 07/18 3:58 PM
MOTION for Recusal of The Honorable Kyle C. Dudek by Randy Zapata.(ABM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/10 3:07 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. By August 9, 2024, Plaintiff must complete and file a long-form application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs (AO Form 239), which is available on the Court's website. Alternatively, by that date, Plaintiff may pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 7/10/2024. (CGW) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/10 7:26 AM
MOTION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Short Form) by Randy Zapata.(JK) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
4 | 4
motion
Recusal
Wed 07/10 7:25 AM
MOTION for Recusal of The Honorable John E. Steele by Randy Zapata.(JK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope | ||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/01 4:07 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the $405 filing fee or move to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affidavits by August 1, 2024. Failing to exercise one of these options may result in this case being dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 7/1/2024. (CGW) |
|
2 | 2
order
Civil Action Order
Mon 07/01 11:53 AM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/1/2024. (CGW) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/28 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT against Discover, Representatives filed by Randy Zapata. Filing Fee Due. Zero (0) service copies recieved.(JK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Subpoenas, | ||
Att: 4 Mailing Envelope |