Collick v. Willey
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Matthew J Maddox |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01874 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 07/31 10:35 AM
Supplement re1 COMPLAINT; MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Riley Lee Collick(bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/26 3:02 PM
ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to either pay the full $402 filing fee or file a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and to Supplement the Complaint within 28 days. Signed by District Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 7/26/2024. (c/m w/enclosures) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/26/2024 (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Notification Letter
Fri 06/28 11:11 AM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Riley Lee Collick. (c/m 6/28/24 - jh6s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/28 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT against Connor Willey, filed by Riley Lee Collick.(jh6s, Deputy Clerk) (jh6s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment | ||
Att: 3 (6/28/2024) Envelope |