Germain v. Akintade et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Julie Rebecca Rubin |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01886 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Fri 08/09 4:03 PM
ORDER DISMISSING w/out prejudice1 Complaint; DENYING2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; CLOSING case. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 8/9/2024. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/09 8:50 AM
Return Document ORDER. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/9/2024. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 First Page of Returned Document, | ||
Att: 2 First Page of Returned Document | ||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/02 2:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING plaintiff 21 days to either pay the filing fee or file a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/2/2024. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Notification Letter
Fri 06/28 12:48 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Jean Bernard Germain. (c/m to P 6/28/24 - av4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Fri 06/28 12:44 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jean Bernard Germain(av4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/28 12:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Akintade, M. Butler, filed by Jean Bernard Germain.(av4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |