Salt Life Beverage Management, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11468
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11468
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-11474 |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Salt Life Beverage Management, LLC
201 W McBee Ave Ste 320
Greenville, SC 29601-5205 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Motion for Joint Administration
Tue 07/02 4:53 PM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration Of Chapter 11 Cases, And (II) Granting Related Relief An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Salt Life Beverage, LLC and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Salt Life Beverage, LLC, Case No. 24-11468 (LSS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case Order Signed on 7/2/2024. (CMB) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 07/01 8:32 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11474 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number 10095028, amount $1738.00. (COH) |
|
Sunday, June 30, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration - Motion
Sun 06/30 7:50 PM
Motion for Joint Administration / Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases Filed By Salt Life Beverage Management, LLC(Ward, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
1 | 1
17
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 06/30 6:57 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Salt Life Beverage Management, LLC. (Ward, Christopher) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Sun 06/30 6:57 PM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (SH) |