D'AMICO v. ASR Group International, Inc. et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry W Blackwell |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02566 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:15 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 10:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
ASR Group International, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
American Sugar Refining, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Commodity Information, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Domino Foods, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Michigan Sugar Company
|
|
Defendant
Richard Wistisen
|
|
Defendant
United Sugar Producers & Refiners Cooperative
|
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca D'Amico
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
MDL Pretrial Order
Mon 08/26 1:43 PM
MDL PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2: Request for Supplemental Information from Counsel, Consolidated Complaint Deadline, and Discovery Stay. (See Order for Complete Details) Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 8/26/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 08/20 5:41 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 8/20/2024: Status Conference. Court Reporter: Erin Drost St. Paul Courthouse, Courtroom 3B Time: 2:06 pm 3:15 pm Total Time: 1 hour 9 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Daniel Hedlund, Alexandra Bernay, Kimberly Justice, Shawn Raiter, Heidi Silton, Dave Cialkowski, Josh Rissman, Michael Flannery, Bobby Pouya, Peter Barile, Adam Zapala, Daniel Warshaw, Melissa Wiener, Abou Anara; Rita Wang, Michele Burkholder, Karen Halbert, Mike Roberts, Erich Schork, Garrett Blanchfield, Elizabeth Fegan, Rachhana Srey, Scott Martin, Joseph Kohn, Christopher Le, Sitso Bediako, Nicole Veno, Michelle Looby, Andrew Wolinsky; Arthur Shingler, Dayron Silverio, Peter Prieto, Joseph Bourne, Jessica Servais, Israel David, Alexander Barrett, Brant Penney For Defendant(s): Lawerence Buterman, Todd Stenerson, Djordje Petkoski, Benjamin Waldin, Moira Penza, Jessica Nelson; Amelia Rasmussen, Gina Tonn, Aaron Knoll, Andre Hanson, Jill Radloff, Dan Mott PROCEEDINGS: Discussion regarding case status. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order/Notice to Attorney
Mon 08/19 1:22 PM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Agenda for August 20, 2024 Initial Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 8/19/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order/Notice to Attorney
Fri 08/16 11:21 AM
(Text-Only) TEXT ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. As stated in Pretrial Order No. 1, counsel who will be trying the case or who in your judgment are likely to be involved in directing any substantive aspect of the case should be present for the August 20, 2024 conference. Counsel who intend to seek a leadership position must attend the initial conference. Attorney Dan Gustafson is excused from attending the conference pursuant to the Text Order at Doc. No. 94. All other attorneys of record will be provided a Zoom link from chambers for a listen-in-only option for attending the conference. People using the Zoom link will not be allowed to speak. The Zoom link will be used for listening only. People using the Zoom link should log into Zoom by 1:45 pm on August 20, 2024. Ordered by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 8/16/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/25 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ronen Sarraf on behalf of Rebecca D'Amico. (Sarraf, Ronen) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
MDL Pretrial Order
Wed 07/17 9:29 AM
MDL PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 7/17/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/01 8:34 AM
Summons Issued as to ASR Group International, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc., Commodity Information, Inc., Domino Foods, Inc., Michigan Sugar Company, United Sugar Producers & Refiners Cooperative, Richard Wistisen. (ABR) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Mon 07/01 8:33 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-2566 (JWB/DTS). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) |
|
Sunday, June 30, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
36
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Sun 06/30 12:47 PM
COMPLAINT against ASR Group International, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc., Commodity Information, Inc., Domino Foods, Inc., Michigan Sugar Company, United Sugar Producers & Refiners Cooperative f/k/a United Sugars Corporation, Richard Wistisen (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11164853) filed by REBECCA D'AMICO. Filer requests summons issued. (Sarraf, Ronen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |