Masoumeh Sadeghi Mahonak et al v. Antony J. Blinken et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fred W Slaughter |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-01443 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 9:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Carson Wu
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Antony J. Blinken
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seyed Mohammad Ali Khatami Firouzabadi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alireza Zadbakhshiseyghalani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Masoumeh Sadeghi Mahonak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maziyar Makaremiesfarjani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elhamalsadat Mirahmadinejad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fatemeh Mohammadkhan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nafise Molamohammadali
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fatemeh Mottaghian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arzoo Salamat Nia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dayana Salamat Nia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fatemeh Noroozi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mohammad Amin Oyarhossein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arezoo Rezaei Rad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reza Robati
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hamidreza Roohafza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vahid Shobeiri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Foojan Soltaninia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Farideh Karbalaipour
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zeinab Abrishami
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maryam Baharvand
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Morteza Daneshmand
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abolfazl Ebrahimi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vahid Ebrahimipour
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hossein Farrokhbakht
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mojde Farzad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mohammad Reza Ganjalikhany
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fatemeh Ghasemifard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salim Rezvani Gilkolaei
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Saeideh Golchinkharrazi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seyed Mohamad Hadi Emadi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Somayed Hessam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hedieh Hosseini
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abbas Bagherian Kasgari
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw Motion/Application/Request/Ex Parte Application
Wed 09/11 10:23 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion to Dismiss EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 17 Defendants maintain their request for an enlargement of pages related to their anticipated motion to dismiss. filed by Defendants Antony J. Blinken, Carson Wu. (McGuire, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 09/10 6:14 PM
OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion to Dismiss EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 17 filed by Plaintiff Masoumeh Sadeghi Mahonak.(Morrison, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Email from Caroline McGuire | ||
17 | 17
motion
Exceed Page Limitation Enlargement of Time to File Document
Tue 09/10 2:12 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion to Dismiss, EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendants Antony J. Blinken, Carson Wu. (McGuire, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Appearance
Mon 09/09 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda Blair Saylor on behalf of Defendants Antony J. Blinken, Carson Wu (Attorney Amanda Blair Saylor added to party Antony J. Blinken(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Blair Saylor added to party Carson Wu(pty:dft))(Saylor, Amanda) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/08 5:33 PM
Notice to Substitute Party (Robert Jachim in place of Carson Wu) filed by Plaintiff Zeinab Abrishami, Maryam Baharvand, Morteza Daneshmand, Abolfazl Ebrahimi, Vahid Ebrahimipour, Hossein Farrokhbakht, Mojde Farzad, Mohammad Reza Ganjalikhany, Fatemeh Ghasemifard, Salim Rezvani Gilkolaei, Saeideh Golchinkharrazi, Seyed Mohamad Hadi Emadi, Somayed Hessam, Hedieh Hosseini, Farideh Karbalaipour, Abbas Bagherian Kasgari, Seyed Mohammad Ali Khatami Firouzabadi, Masoumeh Sadeghi Mahonak, Maziyar Makaremiesfarjani, Elhamalsadat Mirahmadinejad, Fatemeh Mohammadkhan, Nafise Molamohammadali, Fatemeh Mottaghian, Arzoo Salamat Nia, Dayana Salamat Nia, Fatemeh Noroozi, Mohammad Amin Oyarhossein, Arezoo Rezaei Rad, Reza Robati, Hamidreza Roohafza, Vahid Shobeiri, Foojan Soltaninia, Alireza Zadbakhshiseyghalani. (Morrison, Curtis) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 08/07 7:57 AM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,1 filed by Defendants Carson Wu, Antony J. Blinken.(McGuire, Caroline) |
|
Sunday, July 14, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA
Sun 07/14 6:16 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Seyed Mohammad Ali Khatami Firouzabadi, Farideh Karbalaipour, Fatemeh Ghasemifard, Hossein Farrokhbakht, Alireza Zadbakhshiseyghalani, Hamidreza Roohafza, Maziyar Makaremiesfarjani, Masoumeh Sadeghi Mahonak, Foojan Soltaninia, Mohammad Reza Ganjalikhany, Abolfazl Ebrahimi, Fatemeh Noroozi, Somayed Hessam, Morteza Daneshmand, Dayana Salamat Nia, Saeideh Golchinkharrazi, Hedieh Hosseini, Zeinab Abrishami, Mojde Farzad, Reza Robati, Seyed Mohamad Hadi Emadi, Vahid Ebrahimipour, Abbas Bagherian Kasgari, Fatemeh Mottaghian, Arezoo Rezaei Rad, Mohammad Amin Oyarhossein, Vahid Shobeiri, Elhamalsadat Mirahmadinejad, Maryam Baharvand, Nafise Molamohammadali, Fatemeh Mohammadkhan, Arzoo Salamat Nia, Salim Rezvani Gilkolaei, upon Defendant Antony J. Blinken served on 7/5/2024, answer due 9/3/2024; Carson Wu served on 7/5/2024, answer due 9/3/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Morrison, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C, service to US Attorney, Blinken, Wu, Garland | ||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Appearance
Fri 07/12 8:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Caroline McGuire on behalf of Defendants Antony J. Blinken, Carson Wu (Attorney Caroline McGuire added to party Antony J. Blinken(pty:dft), Attorney Caroline McGuire added to party Carson Wu(pty:dft))(McGuire, Caroline) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 07/03 10:32 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Wed 07/03 8:45 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)8 . A corrected summons is attached for U.S. Attorney General. (et) |
|
Att: 1 Summons for US Attorney General | ||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 07/02 5:39 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Carson Wu. (et) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 07/02 5:38 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Antony J. Blinken. (et) |
|
Att: 1 Summons for Civil Process Clerk, | ||
Att: 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney General | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 07/02 5:31 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 07/02 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et) |
|
Sunday, June 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Related Case(s)
Sun 06/30 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs ZEINAB ABRISHAMI, MOHAMMAD AMIN OYARHOSSEIN, ABBAS BAGHERIAN KASGARI, MARYAM BAHARVAND, MORTEZA DANESHMAND, ABOLFAZL EBRAHIMI, VAHID EBRAHIMIPOUR, HOSSEIN FARROKHBAKHT, MOJDE FARZAD, MOHAMMAD REZA GANJALIKHANY, FATEMEH GHASEMIFARD, SAEIDEH GOLCHINKHARRAZI, SEYED MOHAMAD HADI EMADI, SOMAYEH HESSAM, HEDIEH HOSSEINI, FARIDEH KARBALAIPOUR, SEYED MOHAMMAD ALI KHATAMI FIROUZABADI, MAZIYAR MAKAREMIESFARJANI, ELHAMALSADAT MIRAHMADINEJAD, FATEMEH MOHAMMADKHAN, NAFISE MOLAMOHAMMADALI, FATEMEH MOTTAGHIAN, FATEMEH NOROOZI, AREZOO REZAEI RAD, SALIM REZVANI GILKOLAEI, REZA ROBATI, HAMIDREZA ROOHAFZA, MASOUMEH SADEGHI MAHONAK, ARZOO SALAMAT NIA, DAYANA SALAMAT NIA, VAHID SHOBEIRI, FOOJAN SOLTANINIA, ALIREZA ZADBAKHSHISEYGHALANI. Related Case(s): 2:24-cv-04536-FWS-DFM (Morrison, Curtis) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Sun 06/30 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying n/a. (Morrison, Curtis) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Sun 06/30 2:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,1 filed by plaintiffs ZEINAB ABRISHAMI, MOHAMMAD AMIN OYARHOSSEIN, ABBAS BAGHERIAN KASGARI, MARYAM BAHARVAND, MORTEZA DANESHMAND, ABOLFAZL EBRAHIMI, VAHID EBRAHIMIPOUR, HOSSEIN FARROKHBAKHT, MOJDE FARZAD, MOHAMMAD REZA GANJALIKHANY, FATEMEH GHASEMIFARD, SAEIDEH GOLCHINKHARRAZI, SEYED MOHAMAD HADI EMADI, SOMAYEH HESSAM, HEDIEH HOSSEINI, FARIDEH KARBALAIPOUR, SEYED MOHAMMAD ALI KHATAMI FIROUZABADI, MAZIYAR MAKAREMIESFARJANI, ELHAMALSADAT MIRAHMADINEJAD, FATEMEH MOHAMMADKHAN, NAFISE MOLAMOHAMMADALI, FATEMEH MOTTAGHIAN, FATEMEH NOROOZI, AREZOO REZAEI RAD, SALIM REZVANI GILKOLAEI, REZA ROBATI, HAMIDREZA ROOHAFZA, MASOUMEH SADEGHI MAHONAK, ARZOO SALAMAT NIA, DAYANA SALAMAT NIA, VAHID SHOBEIRI, FOOJAN SOLTANINIA, ALIREZA ZADBAKHSHISEYGHALANI. (Morrison, Curtis) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Sun 06/30 2:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs ZEINAB ABRISHAMI, MOHAMMAD AMIN OYARHOSSEIN, ABBAS BAGHERIAN KASGARI, MARYAM BAHARVAND, MORTEZA DANESHMAND, ABOLFAZL EBRAHIMI, VAHID EBRAHIMIPOUR, HOSSEIN FARROKHBAKHT, MOJDE FARZAD, MOHAMMAD REZA GANJALIKHANY, FATEMEH GHASEMIFARD, SAEIDEH GOLCHINKHARRAZI, SEYED MOHAMAD HADI EMADI, SOMAYEH HESSAM, HEDIEH HOSSEINI, FARIDEH KARBALAIPOUR, SEYED MOHAMMAD ALI KHATAMI FIROUZABADI, MAZIYAR MAKAREMIESFARJANI, ELHAMALSADAT MIRAHMADINEJAD, FATEMEH MOHAMMADKHAN, NAFISE MOLAMOHAMMADALI, FATEMEH MOTTAGHIAN, FATEMEH NOROOZI, AREZOO REZAEI RAD, SALIM REZVANI GILKOLAEI, REZA ROBATI, HAMIDREZA ROOHAFZA, MASOUMEH SADEGHI MAHONAK, ARZOO SALAMAT NIA, DAYANA SALAMAT NIA, VAHID SHOBEIRI, FOOJAN SOLTANINIA, ALIREZA ZADBAKHSHISEYGHALANI. (Morrison, Curtis) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sun 06/30 1:35 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37748235 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiffs SEYED MOHAMMAD ALI KHATAMI FIROUZABADI, FARIDEH KARBALAIPOUR, FATEMEH GHASEMIFARD, HOSSEIN FARROKHBAKHT, ALIREZA ZADBAKHSHISEYGHALANI, HAMIDREZA ROOHAFZA, MAZIYAR MAKAREMIESFARJANI, MASOUMEH SADEGHI MAHONAK, FOOJAN SOLTANINIA, MOHAMMAD REZA GANJALIKHANY, ABOLFAZL EBRAHIMI, FATEMEH NOROOZI, SOMAYEH HESSAM, MORTEZA DANESHMAND, DAYANA SALAMAT NIA, SAEIDEH GOLCHINKHARRAZI, HEDIEH HOSSEINI, ZEINAB ABRISHAMI, MOJDE FARZAD, REZA ROBATI, SEYED MOHAMAD HADI EMADI, VAHID EBRAHIMIPOUR, ABBAS BAGHERIAN KASGARI, FATEMEH MOTTAGHIAN, AREZOO REZAEI RAD, MOHAMMAD AMIN OYARHOSSEIN, VAHID SHOBEIRI, ELHAMALSADAT MIRAHMADINEJAD, MARYAM BAHARVAND, NAFISE MOLAMOHAMMADALI, FATEMEH MOHAMMADKHAN, ARZOO SALAMAT NIA, SALIM REZVANI GILKOLAEI. (Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party ZEINAB ABRISHAMI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MOHAMMAD AMIN OYARHOSSEIN(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party ABBAS BAGHERIAN KASGARI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MARYAM BAHARVAND(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MORTEZA DANESHMAND(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party ABOLFAZL EBRAHIMI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party VAHID EBRAHIMIPOUR(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party HOSSEIN FARROKHBAKHT(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MOJDE FARZAD(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MOHAMMAD REZA GANJALIKHANY(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party FATEMEH GHASEMIFARD(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party SAEIDEH GOLCHINKHARRAZI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party SEYED MOHAMAD HADI EMADI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party SOMAYEH HESSAM(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party HEDIEH HOSSEINI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party FARIDEH KARBALAIPOUR(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party SEYED MOHAMMAD ALI KHATAMI FIROUZABADI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MAZIYAR MAKAREMIESFARJANI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party ELHAMALSADAT MIRAHMADINEJAD(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party FATEMEH MOHAMMADKHAN(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party NAFISE MOLAMOHAMMADALI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party FATEMEH MOTTAGHIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party FATEMEH NOROOZI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party AREZOO REZAEI RAD(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party SALIM REZVANI GILKOLAEI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party REZA ROBATI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party HAMIDREZA ROOHAFZA(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MASOUMEH SADEGHI MAHONAK(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party ARZOO SALAMAT NIA(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party DAYANA SALAMAT NIA(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party VAHID SHOBEIRI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party FOOJAN SOLTANINIA(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party ALIREZA ZADBAKHSHISEYGHALANI(pty:pla))(Morrison, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, 82 FR 20956, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, 9 FAM 304.5-9(D) as of October 12, 2021, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, 9 FAM 504.11-2(A), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, US Embassy Mumbai, DS-5535, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, US Embassy Ankara answer to general question, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, U.S. Virtual Embassy Iran AP Estimation, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, U.S. Embassy Abu Dhabi Automatic reply, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, US Embassy Abu Dhabi, United Arab Emirates ABD, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, US Embassy Ankara - After the Interview, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, CEAC Online Case Statuses, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, April 7, 2024 Declaration of Defendant Carson Wu, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit M, 9 FAM § 504.11-3(B)(2)(a), (before February 26, 2024), | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit N, 9 FAM § 504.11-3(B)(2)(a), (after February 26, 2024), | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit O, Excerpt of Transcript, EsmaeilZadeh v Blinken, Case No. 8:23-cv-02118-FWSJDE, oral argument on April 4, 2023, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit P, DOJ Letter explaining Administrative Processing |