Mendoza v. Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Docket Ii - Austin |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00732 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 250th Judicial District Court, Travis County, TX, D-1-GN-24-003522 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 12:13 PM CDT |
Defendant
Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suzanne Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 08/02 4:11 PM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Katie Villalobos to appear on behalf of Suzanne Mendoza. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 08/01 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Toomey on behalf of Suzanne Mendoza. Attorney Ryan Toomey added to party Suzanne Mendoza(pty:pla) (Toomey, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Amend/Correct (Not Judgment)
Wed 07/17 9:21 AM
CORRECTED MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Suzanne Mendoza. (Toomey, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/16 1:35 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Toomey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18987798) by on behalf of Suzanne Mendoza. (Toomey, Ryan) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/01 1:44 PM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order to File Pro Hac Motion
Mon 07/01 1:42 PM
Order Directing Katie Villalobos to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Attachment
Mon 07/01 8:55 AM
ATTACHMENT Designation of Attorney in Charge to1 Notice of Removal, by Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC. (Mayer, Zachary) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Mon 07/01 8:47 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC. (Gant, Robin) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/01 8:42 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-18933507), filed by Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC.(Gant, Robin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/01 1:40 PM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp) |
||
misc
To be Referred to AU Mag Judge
Mon 07/01 1:40 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 07/01 1:41 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC, Suzanne Mendoza. (kp) |