Barwick v. Cumbie et al
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dudley H Bowen |
Referred: | Brian K Epps |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00048 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/26 9:14 AM
ORDER directing service of the5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/26/24. (wwp) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 08/26 9:10 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the re1 Complaint filed by Christopher Lee Barwick should be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/26/24. (wwp) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/01 4:35 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty days of this Order. PLRA due by 7/31/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/1/2024. (maa) (maa) |
|
Att: 1 (7/1/2024) PLRA forms | ||
3 | 3
misc
Inmate Account Statement
Mon 07/01 11:28 AM
Inmate Account Statement by Christopher Lee Barwick. (loh) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/01 11:27 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Christopher Lee Barwick. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(loh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/01 11:26 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Lee Barwick.(loh) |