16
|
|
16
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 4:07 PM
STIPULATION DISCONTINUING ACTION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys of record for the parties that this action be, and the same is hereby discontinued with prejudice, without further costs or disbursements to either party as against the other, and it is also represented that no signing party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action. The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of this action under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) (A)(ii). Dkt. No. 15. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/3/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 11:50 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Damian Grant and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Damian Grant. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Gioia, Lisa)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/07 9:20 AM
ORDER. The Court observes that on August 6, 2024, counsel for Plaintiff filed a discovery related document on the docket of this case. Dkt. No. 13. The Court directs counsel to review and comply the with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the ECF Filing Rules, in particular, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d)(1) and ECF Rule 13.20. The Court has not ordered this discovery material to be filed, and it is not being used in the proceeding. Therefore, it was not properly filed in the docket of this case. The Court again directs counsel for Plaintiff to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the ECF Filing Rules. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/6/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
discov
Rule 26 Disclosure
Tue 08/06 4:28 PM
RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Damian Grant..(Gioia, Lisa)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
order
Case Management Plan
Fri 08/02 5:31 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) (3).All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Settlement discussions have taken place. The parties expect that this case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 4 days. Motions due by 4/28/2025. Deposition due by 10/7/2024. Fact Discovery due by 11/4/2024. Expert Discovery due by 3/27/2025. Status Conference set for 5/12/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/2/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 08/07 3:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/2/2024. (Court Reporter Present) (va)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Letter
Tue 07/30 12:37 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from John P. Grisafi dated July 30, 2024 re: Case Status. Document filed by Jack Dauria, Nonstop Couriers Inc...(Grisafi, John)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/29 12:38 PM
ORDER: The Court has not received the joint status letter and proposed case management plan and scheduling order previously requested in the Court's July 3, 2024 order. The materials were due one week prior to the initial pre-trial conference set for August 2, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to comply with the Court's July 3, 2024 order in its entirety forthwith, and by no later than July 31, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/29/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
misc
Letter
Wed 07/24 1:19 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from John P. Grisafi dated July 24, 2024 re: July 17, 2024 Court Order. Document filed by Jack Dauria, Nonstop Couriers Inc...(Grisafi, John)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/17 12:07 PM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, within two weeks of the date of this order file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, as further set forth herein. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks of the date of this order advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/17/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/16 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa M Gioia on behalf of Damian Grant..(Gioia, Lisa)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Thu 07/11 12:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order with Notice of Entry served on Damian Grant on July 11, 2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jack Dauria, Nonstop Couriers Inc...(Grisafi, John)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 07/11 11:12 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Jack Dauria, Nonstop Couriers Inc..(Grisafi, John)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 07/11 11:11 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Grisafi, John)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/03 11:38 AM
ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx, on July 1, 2024. Dkt. No. 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than July 15, 2024. Additionally, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Counsel for Defendants is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/3/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 07/03 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/2/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(B) of the Court's Individual Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/3/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 07/02 10:40 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Case Designation
Tue 07/02 10:40 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 07/02 10:40 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 07/02 10:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Patrick Grisafi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Damian Grant. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 07/02 10:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney John Patrick Grisafi. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/01 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 803975/2024E. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29553049).Document filed by Nonstop Couriers Inc., Jack Dauria..(Grisafi, John)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A: Summons and Verified Complaint
|