Ashford v. 3M Company Inc et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03774 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 5:24-cv-00665 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 12:37 PM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Toray Fluorofibers (America) Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vera Ashford
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Tue 08/27 10:01 AM
Letter from Plaintiffs re Notice of Pending Motions to Remand. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Earley, Jason) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 07/01 1:05 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 7/1/2024), 5:24-cv-00665, Ashford v. 3M Company Inc et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03774-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
18 | 18
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 07/01 1:03 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 5:24-cv-00665. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE by 3M Company Inc Defendant 3M Company's Notice of The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation's Order Transferring Four Cases to the In Re AFFF MDL(Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
15 | 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Vera Ashford.(Earley, Jason) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of C. Randolph, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. Light Water Brochure, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3. 3M 10-Q, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4. Patent Application, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5. Darwin Transcript, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6. MIL-F 24385, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7. Rog Responses, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8. Tire Specs, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9. Military Specs, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10. Wire Specs, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11. Wire Ad | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Dukes on behalf of Daikin America Inc (Dukes, Matthew) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
13 | 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toray Fluorofibers (America) Inc. filed by Toray Fluorofibers (America) Inc (Hart, Caleigh) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
12 | 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Bendall Kazan on behalf of Toray Fluorofibers (America) Inc (Kazan, Allison) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Caleigh Miller Hart on behalf of Toray Fluorofibers (America) Inc (Hart, Caleigh) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by E Britton Monroe on behalf of Toray Fluorofibers (America) Inc (Monroe, E) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dukes on behalf of Daikin America Inc (Dukes, Matthew) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert V Wood, Jr on behalf of Daikin America Inc (Wood, Robert) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
7 | 7 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the3 Motion for Extension of Time as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/31/2024. (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
Wednesday, May 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A Burkhart on behalf of Daikin America Inc (Burkhart, Charles) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart on behalf of Daikin America Inc (Flachsbart, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L Yeilding on behalf of Daikin America Inc (Yeilding, Christopher) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
3 | 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines by Daikin America Inc. (DeBray, Thomas) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company Inc (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company Inc from CIrcuit Court of Morgan County, Alabama, case number 52-cv-2024-900166 filed by 3M Company Inc. with JURY DEMAND in the state court complaint(AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4599367 (B-11706). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company Inc from CIrcuit Court of Morgan County, Alabama, case number 52-cv-2024-900166 filed by 3M Company Inc. with JURY DEMAND in the state court complaint(AHI). (Radney, W) Modified on 5/28/2024 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/1/2024.] |