ra dais deapocalypse bey v. Springfield Police Department et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine A Robertson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-30082 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 12:49 PM EDT |
Defendant
Jaime Bruno
|
|
Defendant
Trent Duda
Deputy Chief 130 Pearl Street
Springfield, MA 01105 |
|
Defendant
Steven Kent
Police Superintendent City of Springfield Springfield Police Department 130 Pearl Street
Springfield, MA 01105 |
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Martucci
|
|
Defendant
Officer A. Martinez
|
|
Defendant
Officer Lawrence Akers
|
|
Defendant
Officer M. Bermude
|
|
Defendant
Officer S. Stelzer
|
|
Defendant
Springfield Police Department
|
|
Plaintiff
ra dais deapocalypse bey
15 Avon Pl Apt. 5
Springfield, MA 01105 |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Copy Mailed
Mon 08/19 11:51 AM
Copy of docket order #4 and IFP form (long version) mailed to ra dais deapocalypse bey 15 Avon Pl Apt. 5 Springfield, MA 01105 on 8/19/2024. (O'Connor, Lilian) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/19 10:38 AM
Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must, no later than September 9, 2024, file a renewed Application or pay the $405 filing fee. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action by a District Judge. (PSSA, 3) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/19/2024) (PSSA, 3) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/01 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Zamorski, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/01 1:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ra dais deapocalypse bey.(Zamorski, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/01 1:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ra dais deapocalypse bey.(Zamorski, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form |