Elmi v. Blinken et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine M Menendez |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02594 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 10:30 AM CDT |
Defendant
Rena Bitter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Antony Blinken
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Omar Mohamud Elmi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Wed 09/11 12:03 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by Rena Bitter, Antony Blinken, Alejandro Mayorkas.(Tweeten, Andrew) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 09/11 12:02 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by Rena Bitter, Antony Blinken, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Tweeten, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/17 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of Rena Bitter, Antony Blinken, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Tweeten, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/03 3:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Rena Bitter, Antony Blinken, Alejandro Mayorkas. (BTX) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 07/03 3:57 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 24-cv-2594 (KMM/TNL). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BTX) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/01 1:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11167035) filed by Omar Mohamud Elmi. Filer requests summons issued. (Dutt, Alexis) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |