Roussell v. Bohemian Club
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-03961 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Case in other court: | San Francisco Superior Court, CGC-24-614552 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 17, 2024 6:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bohemian Club
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ron Roussell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 09/12 4:37 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Defendant Bohemian Club (Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
Saturday, September 07, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Sat 09/07 5:24 PM
Order denying 20 Motion to Remand entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court denies the motion to remand without prejudice. Within fourteen days (meaning, by September 23, 2024), the plaintiff must file the consolidated complaint that the court previously directed and must simultaneously file a new motion to remand noticed for any available Thursday at 9:30 a.m. at least five weeks from the date of filing. The motion schedule is the ordinary one under Civil L. R. 7-3. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Sat 09/07 5:18 PM
Order granting 23 Administrative Motion entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court grants the stipulated request to file the sur-reply. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Fri 09/06 5:06 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND filed by Bohemian Club. Responses due by 9/10/2024.(Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation and Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Administrative Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Defendant's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand | ||
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Wed 09/04 1:53 PM
REPLY filed byRon Roussell.(Ardestani, Sepideh) |
|
Att: 1 PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Wed 08/28 4:10 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byBohemian Club.(Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration OF JOHN SCHEIDT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOHEMIAN CLUBS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Remand
Wed 08/14 4:46 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ron Roussell. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 8/28/2024. Replies due by 9/4/2024.(Ardestani, Sepideh) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Sepideh Ardestani, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Ron Roussell, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 07/31 9:12 AM
ORDER re: 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. The court grants the motion to consolidate as unopposed. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 07/31/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
oth_sup
Statement of Non-Opposition
Tue 07/30 3:32 PM
Statement of Non-Opposition re15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed byRon Roussell. (Ardestani, Sepideh) |
|
Att: 1 PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 07/25 3:02 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Bohemian Club (Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 07/18 11:47 AM
SECOND STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) re6 Stipulation filed by Bohemian Club. (Bruggebrew, Daniel) Modified on 7/18/2024 (jml, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Consolidate Cases
Tue 07/16 5:48 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Bohemian Club. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 7/30/2024. Replies due by 8/6/2024.(Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 07/15 2:23 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bohemian Club. (Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/11 2:30 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ron Roussell..(Serb, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 07/11 9:50 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting (10) Stipulation to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related. The Court finds that the cases are related: 24-cv-03961-LB and 24-cv-03973-TSH. Associated Cases: 3:24-cv-03961-LB, 3:24-cv-03973-TSH(ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/11 9:06 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bohemian Club.. (Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 07/10 3:50 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re9 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant Bohemian Clubs Administrative Motion filed by Bohemian Club.(Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Wed 07/10 3:45 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Bohemian Club. Responses due by 7/15/2024. (Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/03 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sepideh Ardestani for Plaintiff Ron Roussell (Ardestani, Sepideh) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 07/02 9:41 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (jml, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Mon 07/01 7:33 PM
STIPULATION re1 Notice of Removal, Joint Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by Bohemian Club. (Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 07/01 7:08 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Bohemian Club re1 Notice of Removal, (Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 07/01 6:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bohemian Club re2 Request for Judicial Notice,1 Notice of Removal, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 07/01 3:07 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/15/2024. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
oth_sup
Request for Judicial Notice
Mon 07/01 2:07 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re1 Notice of Removal, filed byBohemian Club. (Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/01 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1331, 1441(c), and 1446, et seq. from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-24-614552. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19574625). Filed by Bohemian Club.(Bruggebrew, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |