Smith v. Pro-Vigil, Inc
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Charlotte N Sweeney |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01838 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:0216(b) - FLSA: Minimum Wage or Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 10:53 AM MDT |
Defendant
Pro-Vigil, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
order
Minute Order
Fri 09/06 12:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for September 23, 2024, at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. The Conference will be conducted by video using the attached instructions. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 9/6/2024. Text Only Entry (mdblc1) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 09/05 4:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 9/5/2024. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time,20 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's partial motion to dismiss on or before September 30, 2024. Text Only Entry.(sphil, ) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 09/05 3:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R. CIV.P 12(b)(2) by Plaintiff Jason Smith. (Engelson, Samuel) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 08/29 3:55 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jason Smith. (Engelson, Samuel) |
|
18 | 18
order
Minute Order
Thu 08/29 1:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties'15 proposed scheduling order appears to inadvertently include an editing comment. The parties are directed to re-file a clean copy of the proposed scheduling order by the close of business August 30, 2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 8/29/2024. Text Only Entry (mdblc1) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/29 1:36 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 8/29/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Thu 08/29 12:03 PM
CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-01838-CNS . (Text Only Entry) (jrobe, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 08/28 4:29 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jason Smith. (Engelson, Samuel) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/28 4:29 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Jason Smith All parties do not consent.. (Engelson, Samuel) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/19 5:12 PM
Partial MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R. CIV.P 12(b)(2) by Defendant Pro-Vigil, Inc.(Collopy, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Note Regarding Default
Tue 08/13 10:55 AM
CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default will not be entered as to Pro-Vigil, Inc re:7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to FED. R. CIV. P. 55(a) as: the affidavit or declaration required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) and the affidavit or declaration concerning defendant(s) military status required by Service Members Civil Relief Act were not filed, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (ccuen, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Leave
Tue 08/06 6:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER: granting10 Defendant Pro-Vigil, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Respond to Complaint Out of Time. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to August 19, 2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 08/06/2024. Text Only Entry(mdblc4,) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Leave
Mon 08/05 11:13 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Respond to Complaint Out of Time by Defendant Pro-Vigil, Inc. (Collopy, Patrick) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 08/05 11:06 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick J. Collopy on behalf of Pro-Vigil, IncAttorney Patrick J. Collopy added to party Pro-Vigil, Inc(pty:dft) (Collopy, Patrick) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 08/05 11:04 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Darin L. Mackender on behalf of Pro-Vigil, IncAttorney Darin L. Mackender added to party Pro-Vigil, Inc(pty:dft) (Mackender, Darin) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 07/30 3:31 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to FED. R. CIV. P. 55(a) by Plaintiff Jason Smith. (Engelson, Samuel) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Mon 07/08 10:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Smith. Pro-Vigil, Inc served on 7/3/2024, answer due 7/24/2024. (Engelson, Samuel) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/03 2:28 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES.Consent Form due by 8/28/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/28/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 7/3/2024. (evaug) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/03 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Consent of Jacob Schmidt by Plaintiff Jason Smith (Engelson, Samuel) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons Issued
Mon 07/01 4:33 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (efoga, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 07/01 4:31 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/01 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Pro-Vigil, Inc (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9756487)Attorney Samuel David Engelson added to party Jason Smith(pty:pla), filed by Jason Smith.(Engelson, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |