Julio Cruz v. Douglas Maertz et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-01451 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 9:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Douglas L. Maertz
|
|
Plaintiff
Julio Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 09/06 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 08/12 8:16 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz, upon Defendant Douglas L. Maertz served on 8/6/2024, answer due 8/27/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DOUGLAS L. MAERTZ D/B/A BUENA PARK LOCK & KEY SHOP in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 07/03 10:56 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: See document for details and deadlines. (es) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 07/02 2:31 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Douglas L. Maertz. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Tue 07/02 2:24 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) |
|
Att: 1 CV11C | ||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 07/01 2:48 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 07/01 2:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 07/01 2:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 07/01 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37753955 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Julio Cruz(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |