Kansas District Court
Judge:Toby Crouse
Referred: Angel D Mitchell
Case #: 2:24-cv-02284
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 2:54 AM CST
Defendant
Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC
a Delaware limited liability company 6416 Long Avenue
Shawnee, KS 66216
Represented By
Christopher Helt
Littler Mendelson, Pc - Kansas City
contact info
Sara E. O'Keefe
Littler Mendelson, Pc - Kansas City
contact info
Daniel B. Boatright
Littler Mendelson, Pc - Kansas City
contact info
Defendant
Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC
a Delaware limited liability company 6416 Long Avenue
Shawnee, KS 66216
Represented By
Christopher Helt
Littler Mendelson, Pc - Kansas City
contact info
Sara E. O'Keefe
Littler Mendelson, Pc - Kansas City
contact info
Daniel B. Boatright
Littler Mendelson, Pc - Kansas City
contact info
Defendant
Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC
a Delaware limited liability company Serve Registered Agent: Platinum Filings, LLC 112 SW 7th Steet Suite 3C
Topeka, KS 66603
Represented By
Christopher Helt
Littler Mendelson, Pc - Kansas City
contact info
Sara E. O'Keefe
Littler Mendelson, Pc - Kansas City
contact info
Daniel B. Boatright
Littler Mendelson, Pc - Kansas City
contact info
Plaintiff
Laurie Harvey
4300 SE Bridle Ct
Lee's Summit, MO 64082
Represented By
Kirk D. Holman
Holman Schiavone, LLC
contact info
Aiman Dvorak
Holman Schiavone, LLC
contact info

GPO Feb 04 2025
dant MRC SNF Management, LLC for the currently named defendant RCSG. Harvey must file her amended complaint, revised in accordance with this order, as a separate docket entry by February 7, 2025. Harvey's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF 36) be denied to the extent that it seeks to add MRCMM, LLC and Midwest Recover-Care, LLC as defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 02/3/2025. (kmc)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER AND REPORT & RECOMMENDATION. granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Amend Complaint. Harvey's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF 36) is granted in part insofar as Harvey is allowed to substitute new defen

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
46 46 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/03 3:27 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (Joint) by Laurie Harvey. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
45 45 order Administratively Closing Case Mon 02/10 8:39 AM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by 03/14/2025. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 02/10/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
44 44 adr ADR Report Wed 02/05 1:51 PM
ADR REPORT by Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC. ADR session held on: January 8, 2025 and conducted by Dave Vogel. Results of ADR: Case settled at ADR. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Boatright, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
43 43 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 02/04 11:20 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint (attorney), filed by Laurie Harvey. Objections to R&R due by 2/18/2025. (This is a duplicate filing of docket entry 42 for administrative purposes.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 02/03/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
42 42 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Complaint Tue 02/04 11:04 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER AND REPORT & RECOMMENDATION. granting in part and denying in part36 Motion to Amend Complaint. Harvey's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF 36) is granted in part insofar as Harvey is allowed to substitute new defendant MRC SNF Management, LLC for the currently named defendant RCSG. Harvey must file her amended complaint, revised in accordance with this order, as a separate docket entry by February 7, 2025. Harvey's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF 36) be denied to the extent that it seeks to add MRCMM, LLC and Midwest Recover-Care, LLC as defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 02/3/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/21 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Subpoena to Compliance Consulting Group, LLC by Laurie Harvey re39 Return of Service of Subpoena (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
40 40 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/17 11:36 AM
RESPONSE by Defendants Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC, Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC re36 Motion to Amend Complaint, (Boatright, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
39 39 service Return of Service of Subpoena Wed 01/15 9:47 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Laurie Harvey executed upon Compliance Consulting Group LLC on 01/10/2025 by personal service (Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 01/10 5:55 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Sara O'Keefe as to Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC, Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC (O'Keefe, Sara)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/10 5:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Third Requests for Production of Documents and documents (RECOVERCARE-HARVEY000406-524 and RECOVERCARE-HARVEY000525-539) by Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC. (O'Keefe, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
36 36 motion Amend Complaint Fri 01/03 12:49 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint re1 Complaint (attorney), by Plaintiff Laurie Harvey Related [+](Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Thursday, December 12, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena Thu 12/12 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA by Laurie Harvey Subpoena to be issued to: Compliance Consulting Group, LLC(Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
34 34 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/12 2:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC by Laurie Harvey. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
33 33 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/10 1:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Requests for Production of Documents by Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC. (O'Keefe, Sara)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/10 1:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Interrogatories to Plaintiff and First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC. (O'Keefe, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
31 31 notice Joint Mediation Notice Fri 12/06 9:26 AM
JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held January 8, 2025 by Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC, Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC (O'Keefe, Sara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/05 7:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents by Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC. (O'Keefe, Sara)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/05 6:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Amended Privilege Log by Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC. (O'Keefe, Sara)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/05 6:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Supplemental Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, Defendant's Privilege Log, and Documents (RECOVERCARE000246-405) by Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC. (O'Keefe, Sara)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/02 4:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Expert Witness and Documents (Harvey Expert 000001-000048 and Harvey Expert Exhibits 000001-000280) by Laurie Harvey. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing Mon 12/02 9:40 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice 25 Motion for Discovery Hearing. It does not appear the parties have reached an impasse as to the scope and nature of any outstanding discovery disputes that require court intervention, so the court does not believe these matters are ripe for a pre-motion discovery conference. The parties should continue to meet and confer to resolve, or at least narrow, their areas of disagreement to those that require court intervention. Further, the parties should act with diligence in doing so, as required by D. Kan. Rule 37.1(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/2/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Discovery Hearing Mon 12/02 8:12 AM
MOTION for Discovery Hearing. Via an email to the court on November 27, 2024, the parties moved the court to schedule a Discovery Hearing. Related [+] (alh)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Friday, November 08, 2024
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Fri 11/08 4:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures Documents (Harvey 000001-000279 and EEOC 000001-000050) by Laurie Harvey. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/07 1:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC by Laurie Harvey. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
22 22 13 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 11/06 3:21 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 21 Joint Motion Requesting the Entry of a Protective Order. With minor, non-substantive revisions, the court enters the proposed order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/6/2024. (bal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
21 21 motion Protective Order Tue 11/05 3:31 PM
Joint Motion Requesting the Entry of a Protective Order. In accordance with the Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders, the parties jointly moved for the entry of a protective order by emailing a copy of their proposed order to the Magistrate Judge's chambers on November 5, 2024. Related [+] (alh)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/05 1:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents and First Interrogatories by Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC. (O'Keefe, Sara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 10/29 4:45 PM
ORDER denying 18 Motion for Protective Order without prejudice for failure to demonstrate good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on October 29, 2024. (mls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
18 18 motion Protective Order Tue 10/22 9:24 AM
Joint Motion Requesting the Entry of a Protective Order. In accordance with the Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders, the parties jointly moved for the entry of a protective order by emailing a copy of their proposed order to the Magistrate Judge's chambers on October 21, 2024. Related [+] (alh)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Thursday, October 17, 2024
17 17 misc Docket Annotation Mon 10/21 2:38 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Corrected Scheduling Order added to16 and to this docket annotation for noticing purposes. The pretrial conference is scheduled for April 22, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone (888-363-4749; access code 3977627). (mls)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Thu 10/17 2:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time 5 days. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 12/6/2024. Mediation deadline 1/28/2025. Discovery deadline 3/28/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/11/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2025 at 10:00 AM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell., Dispositive motion deadline 5/19/2025., Jury Trial set for 2/3/2026 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom (Unknown) before District Judge Toby Crouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on October 17, 2024. (mls)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 10/17 10:38 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE was held on 10/17/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/09 2:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Amended Rule 26 Disclosures by Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC. (O'Keefe, Sara)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/07 5:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC. (Boatright, Daniel)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/07 9:42 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Laurie Harvey. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
11 11 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 10/01 2:31 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sara E. O'Keefe on behalf of Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC. (O'Keefe, Sara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/26 3:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant Recover-Care Shawnee LLC and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Recover-Care Shawnee LLC by Laurie Harvey. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/26 3:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant Recover-Care Healthcare LLC and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Recover-Care Healthcare LLC by Laurie Harvey. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
8 8 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Thu 08/22 4:50 PM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2024 at 10:30 AM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 9/27/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/7/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 10/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on August 22, 2024. (mls)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/12 12:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC.(Boatright, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
6 6 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Tue 07/23 1:27 PM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 8/12/2024 for Defendants Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/23/2024. (jsh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
5 5 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Tue 07/16 4:54 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Laurie Harvey upon Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC served on 7/9/2024, answer due 7/30/2024 (Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Tue 07/16 4:52 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Laurie Harvey upon Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC served on 7/8/2024, answer due 7/29/2024 (Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Tue 07/16 4:47 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Laurie Harvey upon Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC served on 7/8/2024, answer due 7/29/2024 (Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 07/02 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 07/02 2:21 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Recover-Care Healthcare, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee Gardens, LLC, Recover-Care Shawnee, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/01 4:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Laurie Harvey. (Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Mon 07/01 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6403735.), filed by Laurie Harvey.(Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Redacted A,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Redacted B,
Att: 3 Exhibit - Redacted C,
Att: 4 Exhibit - Redacted D