Dawn Hamlett v. Federal Express Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fred W Slaughter |
Referred: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-01453 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Orange County Superior Court, 30-02024-01401813-CU- |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 9:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Federal Express Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Darrel Marks
|
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Hamlett
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Tue 09/10 9:15 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court - Central Justice Center. Case number: 30-02024 01401813-CU-WT-CJC. (jp) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 09/10 9:13 AM
ORDER Re Stipulation for an Order Remanding This Action to State Court Jurisdiction11 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter the following: (1) The court FINDS Plaintiff's damages in this action, which include his claims for front pay, back pay, compensatory damages, emotional distress damages, punitive damages, attorney's fees, litigation costs, and expenses, do not satisfy the jurisdictional amount-in-controversy requirement of $75,000.00;; (2) The court ORDERS the above-captioned case REMANDED to the Superior Court of California, County of Orange, in Case Number 30-2024 01401813-CU-WT-CJC, for all further proceedings. See document for further information. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Remand Case to State Court
Fri 09/06 3:36 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation.(Wilson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/06 12:16 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than 9/12/2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution for failure to file a joint report under Rule 26(f). The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to 10/3/2024, at 9:00 AM. (jp) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 07/18 8:39 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2024 at 9:00 a.m. *See Order for details.* (mku) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 07/18 8:22 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Wed 07/17 1:23 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:24-cv-01453 FWS(ADSx). (rn) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Tue 07/02 3:25 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) |
|
Att: 1 CV11C Statement of Consent | ||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/01 4:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation identifying FedEx Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilson, David) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/01 4:14 PM
Notice filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation. Notice of No Related Cases or Pendency of Other Actions (Wilson, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 07/01 4:11 PM
Certification of Interested Entities or Persons NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation, identifying FedEx Corporation. (Wilson, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 07/01 4:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation. (Wilson, David) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 07/01 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2024 01401813-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-37754735 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation. (Attorney David S. Wilson, III added to party Federal Express Corporation(pty:dft))(Wilson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration David S. Wilson, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Karen Sasso, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Matthew Endlish | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 07/02 3:22 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Federal Express Corporation, Darrel Marks, Does 1 through 50. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Dawn Hamlett. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/23/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (et) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Tue 07/02 3:24 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation, successor by merger to FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT G TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (et) |